Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:06:06 (UTC).

BRASSFIELD, SHERI JANELLE - VS - BRASSFIELD, LEON

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 BRASSFIELD, SHERI JANELLE - filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against - BRASSFIELD, LEON. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DETHOMASIS, CRAIG C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1008

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DETHOMASIS, CRAIG C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRASSFIELD, SHERI JANELLE

Alachua, FL 32615

Respondent

BRASSFIELD, LEON

Gainesville, FL 32608

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; SHERI JANELLE BRASSFIELD (PETITIONER);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingD.V. TEMP. INJ./CUSTODY; Judge: DETHOMASIS, CRAIG C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DispositionDOMESTIC VIOLENCE F.S. 741.30; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/12/2021; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO - BOTH PARTIES PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; LEON BRASSFIELD (RESPONDENT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED 4/13/21; LEON BRASSFIELD (RESPONDENT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: D.V. TEMP. INJ./CUSTODY ; Date: 04/22/2021 Time: 8:30 am ; Judge: DIV DV - EVENT JUDGE Location: COURTROOM 3-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION/CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less