This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/14/2023 at 07:21:19 (UTC).

BORSOS, SAMMY D -VS- VAUGHN, RICHARD et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 BORSOS, SAMMY D filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against VAUGHN, RICHARD. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3657

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BORSOS, SAMMY D

Defendants

VAUGHN, RICHARD

Gainesville, FL 32601

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD VAUGHN

MARSHALL, JACLYN

Gainesville, FL 32601

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACLYN MARSHALL

AKINS, RUSSELL L

Fort White, FL 32038

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RUSSELL L AKINS

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOCKS ESQ, PETER C

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 2630-A Nw 41 St

Gainesville, FL 32606

Defendant Attorney

WHITTEN ESQ, NILES B

1031 Nw 6Th Street F-3

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT RUSSELL AKINS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER (REOPEN)

03/10/2023: DEFENDANT RUSSELL AKINS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER (REOPEN)

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/02/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO DISMISS (REOPEN)

02/27/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS (REOPEN)

DESIGNATIONOF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

02/22/2023: DESIGNATIONOF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

02/22/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

DEFENDANT RUSSELL L. AKINS MOTION TO DISMISS (REOPEN)

02/20/2023: DEFENDANT RUSSELL L. AKINS MOTION TO DISMISS (REOPEN)

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (amended as to the time only)

01/19/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (amended as to the time only)

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED AS TO TIME ONLY); FEBRUARY 21, 2023 11:00PM

01/17/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED AS TO TIME ONLY); FEBRUARY 21, 2023 11:00PM

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ; FEBRUARY 21, 2023 @ 1:00 PM

01/13/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ; FEBRUARY 21, 2023 @ 1:00 PM

NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 20, 2023 @ 2:00 PM

01/10/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 20, 2023 @ 2:00 PM

DEFENDANT RUSSELL L. AKINS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

01/05/2023: DEFENDANT RUSSELL L. AKINS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

12/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND (REOPEN)

12/27/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND (REOPEN)

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT - ISSUED (12/28/2022-KBH) ; JACLYN MARSHALL (DEFENDANT);

12/27/2022: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT - ISSUED (12/28/2022-KBH) ; JACLYN MARSHALL (DEFENDANT);

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT - ISSUED (12/28/2022-KBH) ; RICHARD VAUGHN (DEFENDANT);

12/27/2022: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT - ISSUED (12/28/2022-KBH) ; RICHARD VAUGHN (DEFENDANT);

DEFENDANT RUSSELL L AKINS MOTION TO DISMISS; RUSSELL L AKINS (DEFENDANT);

12/22/2022: DEFENDANT RUSSELL L AKINS MOTION TO DISMISS; RUSSELL L AKINS (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 12/6/2022; JACLYN MARSHALL (DEFENDANT);

12/07/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 12/6/2022; JACLYN MARSHALL (DEFENDANT);

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT RUSSELL AKINS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATIONOF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT RUSSELL L. AKINS MOTION TO DISMISS (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (amended as to the time only)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED AS TO TIME ONLY); FEBRUARY 21, 2023 11:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ; FEBRUARY 21, 2023 @ 1:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 20, 2023 @ 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE(CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: AS THE VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM HAS NOT BEEN FILED. THE FORM IS AVAILABLE ON THE ALACHUA COUNTY CLERK'S WEBSITE Receipt: 493486 Date: 11/17/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: AS THE VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM HAS NOT BEEN FILED. THE FORM IS AVAILABLE ON THE ALACHUA COUNTY CLERK'S WEBSITE Receipt: 493486 Date: 11/17/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: AS THE VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM HAS NOT BEEN FILED. THE FORM IS AVAILABLE ON THE ALACHUA COUNTY CLERK'S WEBSITE Receipt: 493486 Date: 11/17/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE FOR ADDITIONAL PAGES OF LIS PENDENS Receipt: 493486 Date: 11/17/2022; Amount: $4.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE - FIRST PAGE OF LIS PENDENS Receipt: 493486 Date: 11/17/2022; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE FEE Receipt: 493486 Date: 11/17/2022; Amount: $70.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE (=>$250.000.) Receipt: 493486 Date: 11/17/2022; Amount: $1,905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less