This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/23/2021 at 12:43:08 (UTC).

BONNET LAKE HOLDINGS -VS- WALKER, CRYSTAL MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 BONNET LAKE HOLDINGS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WALKER, CRYSTAL MICHELLE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0790

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BONNET LAKE HOLDINGS

Defendant

WALKER, CRYSTAL MICHELLE

Melrose, FL 32666

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRASHEAR ESQ, BRUCE

925 Nw 56 Terr Ste C

Gainesville, FL 32605

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 466927 Date: 03/04/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/03/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 466927 Date: 03/04/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 7.322, FLORIDA SMALL CLAIMS RULES. PLEASE SEE CLERK WEBSITE, UNDER SMALL CLAIMS SECTION FOR CORRECT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR) Receipt: 466927 Da

03/03/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 7.322, FLORIDA SMALL CLAIMS RULES. PLEASE SEE CLERK WEBSITE, UNDER SMALL CLAIMS SECTION FOR CORRECT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR) Receipt: 466927 Date: 03/04/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00

03/16/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS INCORRECT; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS", THEN CLICK ON THE LINK & ON THE NEXT PAGE SCROLL DOWN & CLICK ON \u201c+ V

03/15/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS INCORRECT; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS", THEN CLICK ON THE LINK & ON THE NEXT PAGE SCROLL DOWN & CLICK ON \u201c+ VIEW SMALL CLAIMS FORMS HERE THEN "SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL"; WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS $10 FEE HAS BEEN PAID \u2013 CMW 3/18/2021); ; Receipt: 467485 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS INCORRECT; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS", THEN CLICK ON THE LINK & ON THE NEXT PAGE SCROLL DOWN & CLICK ON + VIEW SM

03/15/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS INCORRECT; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS", THEN CLICK ON THE LINK & ON THE NEXT PAGE SCROLL DOWN & CLICK ON + VIEW SMALL CLAIMS FORMS HERE THEN "SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL"; WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS $10 FEE HAS BEEN PAID CMW 3/18/2021); ; Receipt: 467485 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467485; Paid: $10.00; Applied: $10.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS INCORRECT; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS", THEN CLICK ON THE LINK & ON THE NEXT PAGE SCROLL DOWN & CLICK ON + VIEW SMALL CLAIMS FORMS HERE THEN "SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL"; WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS $10 FEE HAS BEEN PAID CMW 3/18/2021); ; Receipt: 467485 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 466927; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $320.00; Total Fee Paid: $320.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 7.322, FLORIDA SMALL CLAIMS RULES. PLEASE SEE CLERK WEBSITE, UNDER SMALL CLAIMS SECTION FOR CORRECT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR) Receipt: 466927 Date: 03/04/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 466927 Date: 03/04/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRASHEAR ESQ, BRUCE