Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 15:22:39 (UTC).

BAUERFEIND, JULIA -VS- HOYOS, DIEGO DE

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 BAUERFEIND, JULIA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HOYOS, DIEGO DE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2332

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

BAUERFEIND, JULIA

DE HOYOS, DIEGO

Gainesville, FL 32605

Respondents

HOYOS, DIEGO DE

Gainesville, FL 32605

BAUERFEIND, JULIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

KELLY ESQ, JOHN J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

804 Nw 16Th Ave Unit B

Gainesville, FL 32601

WALKER ESQ, S SCOTT

527 E University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

JACOBSON ESQ, JUSTIN D

2815 Nw 13 St Ste 305

Gainesville, FL 32609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO AND MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL, WAIVER OF HEARING AND WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketORDER REQUIRING DISCLOSURE OF CHILD PROTECTION TEAM/ DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES RECORDS AND REPORTS AND COMPELLING WITNESS TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCase Reopened this date; AS TO MOTION FOR CHILD PROTECTION TEAM/DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES TO PROVIDE RECORDS AND PROVIDE TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR CHILD PROTECTION TEAM/DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES TO PROVIDE RECORDS AND PROVIDE TESTIMONY (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER FOR SOCIAL INVESTIGATION AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING PARENTING PLAN, PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 61.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketJUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 407508; Paid: $295.00; Applied: $295.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE AND COUNTERPETITION Receipt: 407508 Date: 09/15/2017; Amount: $295.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - UNSERVED; DIEGO DE HOYOS (RESPONDENT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketORDER ON PETITIONER/MOTHERS MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketPETITIONER/MOTHERS MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $605.00; Total Fee Paid: $605.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 404153; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 404153 Date: 07/03/2017; DIEGO DE HOYOS (RESPONDENT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF Receipt: 404153 Date: 07/03/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER ESQ, S SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY ESQ, JOHN J