Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 20:33:44 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE -vs- BUSHOVEN, STEPHEN

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BUSHOVEN, STEPHEN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2344

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

BUSHOVEN, STEPHEN

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STERN ESQ, DANA M

7765 Sw 87 Ave, Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

STERN ESQ, JONATHAN D

7765 Sw 87 Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE ; (99 CLOSE); (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

05/02/2019: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE ; (99 CLOSE); (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

04/29/2019: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

04/25/2019: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

RETURN OF SERVICE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - SERVED 4/23/2019 AS TO: CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1

04/23/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - SERVED 4/23/2019 AS TO: CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1

MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (REOPEN) ; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1); Receipt: 435989 Date: 04/04/2019; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/04/2019: MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (REOPEN) ; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1); Receipt: 435989 Date: 04/04/2019; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MAIL RETURNED; STEPHEN BUSHOVEN

04/27/2018: MAIL RETURNED; STEPHEN BUSHOVEN

FINAL JUDGMENT- SIGNED 4/20/2018 //DRF (CLOSES)

04/20/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT- SIGNED 4/20/2018 //DRF (CLOSES)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

04/16/2018: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT (AFTER STIPULATION) (REOPEN)

04/16/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT (AFTER STIPULATION) (REOPEN)

MAIL RETURNED; STEPHEN BUSHOVEN

02/06/2018: MAIL RETURNED; STEPHEN BUSHOVEN

ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE (CLOSED)

01/17/2018: ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE (CLOSED)

SETTLEMENT STIPULATION (CLOSES)

01/11/2018: SETTLEMENT STIPULATION (CLOSES)

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; STEPHEN BUSHOVEN

08/28/2017: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; STEPHEN BUSHOVEN

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/26/2017: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: STEPHEN BUSHOVEN; Receipt: 405226 Date: 07/25/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/24/2017: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: STEPHEN BUSHOVEN; Receipt: 405226 Date: 07/25/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/24/2017: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

07/24/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 405226 Date: 07/25/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/24/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 405226 Date: 07/25/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE ; (99 CLOSE); (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - SERVED 4/23/2019 AS TO: CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 04/04/2019; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 03/27/2019; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 435989; Paid: $85.00; Applied: $85.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHED NOTICE TO DEFENDANT & CLAIM OF EXEMPTION ISSUED 4/4/2019 / CMW; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (REOPEN) ; (CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION; GARNISHEE #1); Receipt: 435989 Date: 04/04/2019; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT STIPULATION (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; STEPHEN BUSHOVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 405226; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $395.00; Total Fee Paid: $395.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: STEPHEN BUSHOVEN; Receipt: 405226 Date: 07/25/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 405226 Date: 07/25/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERN , DANA M