This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2022 at 15:59:02 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA -VS- SZWEDZIAK, JAROSLAW

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SZWEDZIAK, JAROSLAW. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1576

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

SZWEDZIAK, JAROSLAW

Newberry, FL 32669

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUNDAWALA ESQ, JOY LYNN

7901 Sw 6 Ct, Ste 310

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 469587 Date: 05/10/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/07/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 469587 Date: 05/10/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/07/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

05/07/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/07/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 469587 Date: 05/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/10/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 469587 Date: 05/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/11/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ; SERVED 6/14/2021 TO JAROSLAW SZWEDZIAK

06/14/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ; SERVED 6/14/2021 TO JAROSLAW SZWEDZIAK

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT - MEDIATOR ASSIGNED

07/02/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT - MEDIATOR ASSIGNED

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - NO AGREEMENT

07/09/2021: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - NO AGREEMENT

NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 28, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M.

07/29/2021: NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 28, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M.

AMENDED NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING; 9/28/2021 @ 9:00 AM; NON-JURY TRIAL

09/09/2021: AMENDED NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING; 9/28/2021 @ 9:00 AM; NON-JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

09/14/2021: PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

09/16/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

EXHIBITS FROM; JAROSLAW SZWEDZIAK (DEFENDANT);

09/21/2021: EXHIBITS FROM; JAROSLAW SZWEDZIAK (DEFENDANT);

EXHIBITS FROM; JAROSLAW SZWEDZIAK (DEFENDANT);

09/21/2021: EXHIBITS FROM; JAROSLAW SZWEDZIAK (DEFENDANT);

STIPULATION AND ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION (CLOSED)

10/04/2021: STIPULATION AND ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION (CLOSED)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $5,001 TO $8,000; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/07/2021; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION (CLOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS FROM; JAROSLAW SZWEDZIAK (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS FROM; JAROSLAW SZWEDZIAK (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING; 9/28/2021 @ 9:00 AM; NON-JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 28, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - NO AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ; SERVED 6/14/2021 TO JAROSLAW SZWEDZIAK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 469587; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/02/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 469587 Date: 05/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 469587 Date: 05/10/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUNDAWALA, JOY LYNN