Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 05/05/2021 at 16:10:15 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA -VS- STRAUGHN, TERRY WAYNE

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STRAUGHN, TERRY WAYNE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1218

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

STRAUGHN, TERRY WAYNE

Gainesville, FL 32605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA ESQ, JORGE L

815 Nw 57 Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 04/14/2021

04/15/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 04/14/2021

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/12/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/07/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 468310 Date: 04/07/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/07/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 468310 Date: 04/07/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

04/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

04/07/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/07/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 468310 Date: 04/07/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/07/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 468310 Date: 04/07/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468310; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 468310 Date: 04/07/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 05/28/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 468310 Date: 04/07/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.