Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/12/2020 at 12:13:07 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA -VS- DREW, AMY BOHANNON

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DREW, AMY BOHANNON. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3264

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

DREW, AMY BOHANNON

Gainesville, FL 32609

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

01/29/2019: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

01/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT

01/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT

PROOF OF SERVICE- SERVED; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);

01/23/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE- SERVED; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

01/23/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

01/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT - ISSUED AS TO; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);

01/23/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT - ISSUED AS TO; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);

11/09/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

10/05/2018: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 426532 Date: 10/01/2018; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/28/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 426532 Date: 10/01/2018; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/28/2018: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

09/28/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT Receipt: 426532 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/28/2018: COMPLAINT Receipt: 426532 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 09/28/2018; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE- SERVED; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT - ISSUED AS TO; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 426532; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 426532 Date: 10/01/2018; AMY BOHANNON DREW (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 426532 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant