This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/04/2020 at 00:15:46 (UTC).

AXOGEN CORPORATION -VS- TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 AXOGEN CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2055

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AXOGEN CORPORATION

Defendants

TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP

9303 Pinecroft Dr Ste 280

The Woodlands, TX 77380

APOLLO HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP

9303 Pinecroft Dr Ste 280

The Woodlands, TX 77380

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERSH ESQ, ADAM

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 119 S Dakota Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT Receipt: 403211 Date: 06/09/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/09/2017: COMPLAINT Receipt: 403211 Date: 06/09/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

06/09/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

06/09/2017: PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

SUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP F/K/A APOLLO HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 403211 Date: 06/09/2017; ; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/09/2017: SUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP F/K/A APOLLO HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 403211 Date: 06/09/2017; ; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT GENERAL ALLEGATIONS

06/14/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT GENERAL ALLEGATIONS

SUMMONS - UNISSUED (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE- DUPLICATE SUMMONS- PREVIOUSLY ISSUED 6/20/17 AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT) SCS

06/21/2017: SUMMONS - UNISSUED (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE- DUPLICATE SUMMONS- PREVIOUSLY ISSUED 6/20/17 AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT) SCS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SERVED 7/05/2017; TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP (DEFENDANT);

08/01/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SERVED 7/05/2017; TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 8/03/2017 AS TO: TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP F/K/A APOLLO HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP (DEFENDANT);;

08/01/2017: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 8/03/2017 AS TO: TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP F/K/A APOLLO HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP (DEFENDANT);;

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/15/2017: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

11/21/2017: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING

11/28/2017: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

12/05/2017: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES); 12/27/17 RETURNED MAIL / TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP / ADDRESS UPDATED

12/13/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES); 12/27/17 RETURNED MAIL / TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP / ADDRESS UPDATED

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

12/13/2017: HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

MAIL RETURNED / TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP / ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN

01/09/2018: MAIL RETURNED / TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP / ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED / TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP / ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/09/2017; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES); 12/27/17 RETURNED MAIL / TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP / ADDRESS UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 8/03/2017 AS TO: TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP F/K/A APOLLO HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP (DEFENDANT);;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SERVED 7/05/2017; TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - UNISSUED (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE- DUPLICATE SUMMONS- PREVIOUSLY ISSUED 6/20/17 AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT) SCS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT GENERAL ALLEGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 403211; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: TEXIENNE HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP F/K/A APOLLO HOSPITAL SYSTEM LP (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 403211 Date: 06/09/2017; ; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 403211 Date: 06/09/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AXOGEN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERSH , ADAM