This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 12/24/2022 at 17:27:19 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK -VS- HILL, TRUDELL

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HILL, TRUDELL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4177

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

HILL, TRUDELL

Hawthorne, FL 32640

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN ESQ, SCOTT E

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy, Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) Receipt: 493159 Date: 11/09/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/09/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) Receipt: 493159 Date: 11/09/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

11/09/2022: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493159 Date: 11/09/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/09/2022: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493159 Date: 11/09/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION ; FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

12/07/2022: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION ; FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 12/16/2022

12/19/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 12/16/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION ; FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 01/20/2023 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 493159; Paid: 493159; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493159 Date: 11/09/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) Receipt: 493159 Date: 11/09/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric