Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 13:45:11 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK -vs- CRAIG, PATRICIA

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CRAIG, PATRICIA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0036

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

CRAIG, PATRICIA

Gainesville, FL 32606

CRAIG, PATRICIA E

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ESQ, NATAIJA J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 10751 Deerwood Park Blvd, Suite 100

Jacksonville, FL 32256

 

Court Documents

JUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

12/10/2019: JUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING - 11/22/19 @ 3:30

10/22/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING - 11/22/19 @ 3:30

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

07/23/2019: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

07/23/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLA R.JUD. ADMIN 2.425

07/23/2019: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLA R.JUD. ADMIN 2.425

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

07/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STYLE TO NAME AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS PLAINTIFF

01/04/2019: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STYLE TO NAME AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STYLE TO NAME ; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS PLAINTIFF

12/20/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STYLE TO NAME ; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 1/23/2018 ; PATRICIA CRAIG AKA PATRICIA E CRAIG

02/05/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 1/23/2018 ; PATRICIA CRAIG AKA PATRICIA E CRAIG

ANSWER; PATRICIA CRAIG; (PLAINTIFF HAS ATTORNEY)

02/05/2018: ANSWER; PATRICIA CRAIG; (PLAINTIFF HAS ATTORNEY)

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

01/16/2018: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

01/04/2018: MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ; PATRICIA CRAIG AKA PATRICIA E CRAIG; Receipt: 412383 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/04/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ; PATRICIA CRAIG AKA PATRICIA E CRAIG; Receipt: 412383 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

01/04/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 412383 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/04/2018: COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 412383 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 11/22/19 @ 3:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLA R.JUD. ADMIN 2.425

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STYLE TO NAME AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STYLE TO NAME ; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 1/23/2018 ; PATRICIA CRAIG AKA PATRICIA E CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; PATRICIA CRAIG; (PLAINTIFF HAS ATTORNEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 412383; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ; PATRICIA CRAIG AKA PATRICIA E CRAIG; Receipt: 412383 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ; Receipt: 412383 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brown, Nataija Joyce