Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/03/2020 at 22:22:04 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK -VS- WALTZ, JEFF et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALTZ, JEFF. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1915

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

Defendants

JEFF WALTZ

WALTZ, JEFF

Hawthorne, FL 32640

JAP SHOP THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN ESQ, SCOTT E

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy, Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

LETTER; ; LETTER TRANSFERRING CIRCUIT CASE; Sent on: 10/03/2017 15:02:58.72

10/03/2017: LETTER; ; LETTER TRANSFERRING CIRCUIT CASE; Sent on: 10/03/2017 15:02:58.72

COVER LETTER RETURNED WITH POSTAGE FEES

10/03/2017: COVER LETTER RETURNED WITH POSTAGE FEES

LETTER REQUESTING POSTAGE FEES

09/18/2017: LETTER REQUESTING POSTAGE FEES

COVER LETTER RETURNED WITH TRANSFER FEE

09/18/2017: COVER LETTER RETURNED WITH TRANSFER FEE

LETTER REQUESTING TRANSFER FEES

08/23/2017: LETTER REQUESTING TRANSFER FEES

EX PARTE ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

08/22/2017: EX PARTE ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

08/22/2017: PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

SUMMONS ISSUED; JEFF WALTZ (DEFENDANT);

06/15/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED; JEFF WALTZ (DEFENDANT);

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

06/15/2017: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 402695 Date: 05/31/2017; CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE TO MANY DEFENDANTS ON SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/31/2017: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 402695 Date: 05/31/2017; CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE TO MANY DEFENDANTS ON SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION FOR APPONITMENT OF ELISOR

05/31/2017: MOTION FOR APPONITMENT OF ELISOR

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/31/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT Receipt: 402695 Date: 05/31/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/31/2017: COMPLAINT Receipt: 402695 Date: 05/31/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketRECEIPT TRANSFER (FROM DUVAL COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS; Status: TRANSFERRED; Status Date: 05/31/2017; Disposition: OT01 - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 408384; Paid: $1.57; Applied: $1.57; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketPOSTAGE FEE Receipt: 408384 Date: 10/03/2017; Amount: $1.57; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER; ; LETTER TRANSFERRING CIRCUIT CASE; Sent on: 10/03/2017 15:02:58.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER RETURNED WITH POSTAGE FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER REQUESTING POSTAGE FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER RETURNED WITH TRANSFER FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER REQUESTING TRANSFER FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; JEFF WALTZ (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $411.57; Total Fee Paid: $411.57; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 402695; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 402695 Date: 05/31/2017; CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE TO MANY DEFENDANTS ON SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR APPONITMENT OF ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 402695 Date: 05/31/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric