This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/22/2023 at 09:59:29 (UTC).

ALLY BANK -vs- PERRY, LETHA M

Case Summary

On 03/08/2023 ALLY BANK filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against PERRY, LETHA M. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1001

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLY BANK

Defendant

PERRY, LETHA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOPF ESQ, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND DAMAGES Receipt: 498540 Date: 03/08/2023; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/06/2023: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND DAMAGES Receipt: 498540 Date: 03/08/2023; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

03/06/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

SUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE; CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS) ; Receipt: 498540 Date: 03/08/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/06/2023: SUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE; CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS) ; Receipt: 498540 Date: 03/08/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 499580 Date: 03/23/2023; LETHA M PERRY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/21/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 499580 Date: 03/23/2023; LETHA M PERRY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (REOPEN)

03/29/2023: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (REOPEN)

REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ( CC ON CASE FOR PL ATTY)

04/06/2023: REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ( CC ON CASE FOR PL ATTY)

CERTIFIED COPY OF REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

04/10/2023: CERTIFIED COPY OF REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ( CC ON CASE FOR PL ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialReceipt #: 499580; Paid: 499580; Applied: $10.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 499580 Date: 03/23/2023; LETHA M PERRY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $505.00; Total Fee Paid: $505.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • FinancialReceipt #: 498540; Paid: 498540; Applied: $495.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketREPLEVIN FEE Receipt: 498540 Date: 03/08/2023; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE; CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS) ; Receipt: 498540 Date: 03/08/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND DAMAGES Receipt: 498540 Date: 03/08/2023; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less