Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 20:22:29 (UTC).

ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA -VS- WALKER, CHRISTOPHER ALAN

Case Summary

On 11/22/2017 ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALKER, CHRISTOPHER ALAN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3688

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA

412 E University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant

WALKER, CHRISTOPHER ALAN

Fort White, FL 32038

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

02/15/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

02/08/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE AFTER STIPULATION (REOPEN)

02/08/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE AFTER STIPULATION (REOPEN)

STIPULATION (CLOSES)

01/09/2018: STIPULATION (CLOSES)

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 410659 Date: 11/22/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/22/2017: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 410659 Date: 11/22/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2)

11/22/2017: CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $5000.00) ; Receipt: 410659 Date: 11/22/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/22/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $5000.00) ; Receipt: 410659 Date: 11/22/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $2,500.01 TO $5,000.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 02/08/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE AFTER STIPULATION (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCase Reopened this date 2/8/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T; Result: STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $2,500.01 TO $5,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/22/2017; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 410659; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 410659 Date: 11/22/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 01/12/2018 Time: 10:00 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV IV, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-A; ; Result: STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $5000.00) ; Receipt: 410659 Date: 11/22/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION is a litigant