Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:04:39 (UTC).

ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA -VS- ALMENDAREZ, KARLA ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALMENDAREZ, KARLA ORTEGA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1266

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA

412 E University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant

ALMENDAREZ, KARLA ORTEGA

Gainesville, FL 32608

 

Court Documents

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 04/21/2021

04/23/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 04/21/2021

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 468527 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/12/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 468527 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 468527 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/12/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 468527 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/12/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2)

04/12/2021: CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468527; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 468527 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 05/21/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 468527 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION is a litigant