This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/24/2021 at 10:36:19 (UTC).

ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA -VS- JEROR, KRYSTAL DAWN

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JEROR, KRYSTAL DAWN. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1459

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLIANCE CRECIT UNION OF FLORIDA

ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA

412 E University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant

JEROR, KRYSTAL DAWN

Lake City, FL 32025

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT(CLOSES)

07/26/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT(CLOSES)

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE(SRL)

07/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE(SRL)

AFFIDAVIT(SRL)

07/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT(SRL)

ENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES);

07/06/2021: ENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES);

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. / DEFAULT / PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY TO FILE AFFIDAVIT AND PROPOSED ORDER WITHIN 30 DAYS

07/02/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. / DEFAULT / PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY TO FILE AFFIDAVIT AND PROPOSED ORDER WITHIN 30 DAYS

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 06/09/2021

06/23/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 06/09/2021

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 06/09/2021; KRYSTAL DAWN JEROR (DEFENDANT);

06/22/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 06/09/2021; KRYSTAL DAWN JEROR (DEFENDANT);

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 469213 Date: 04/28/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/28/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 469213 Date: 04/28/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2); LAWANDA FORD, PAMELA LIPSCOMB AND DAVID CARNALL

04/28/2021: CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2); LAWANDA FORD, PAMELA LIPSCOMB AND DAVID CARNALL

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 469213 Date: 04/28/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/28/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 469213 Date: 04/28/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $2,500.01 TO 5,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/28/2021; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT(CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE(SRL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT(SRL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. / DEFAULT / PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY TO FILE AFFIDAVIT AND PROPOSED ORDER WITHIN 30 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 06/09/2021; KRYSTAL DAWN JEROR (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 469213; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/02/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 469213 Date: 04/28/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2); LAWANDA FORD, PAMELA LIPSCOMB AND DAVID CARNALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 469213 Date: 04/28/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION is a litigant