This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/01/2023 at 16:27:11 (UTC).

ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT LLC -VS- KING, STEPHANIE

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KING, STEPHANIE. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4193

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

KING, STEPHANIE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAHNAVARD ESQ, ALI R

Attorney at O & L LAW GROUP PL

O & L Law Group Pl, 110 W Columbus Dr

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) Receipt: 493203 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) Receipt: 493203 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/10/2022: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/10/2022: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 493203 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 493203 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/28/2022: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED; STEPHANIE KING (DEFENDANT);

12/07/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED; STEPHANIE KING (DEFENDANT);

COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

12/16/2022: COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

12/16/2022: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

12/27/2022: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $5,001 TO $8,000; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/10/2022; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF SERVICE HRG (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE ; Date: 03/03/2023 Time: 11:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED; STEPHANIE KING (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 12/16/2022 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 493203; Paid: 493203; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 493203 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) Receipt: 493203 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAHNAVARD ALI R