Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 22:18:25 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC -vs- VO, MARY A

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VO, MARY A. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4864

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

VO, MARY A

Alachua, FL 32615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE ESQ, ASHLEY L

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

07/01/2019: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

01/08/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: MARY A VO; Receipt: 430796 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: MARY A VO; Receipt: 430796 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/31/2018: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430796 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: (E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430796 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/31/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 430796; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: MARY A VO; Receipt: 430796 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430796 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE , ASHLEY L