This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 03/18/2023 at 11:09:15 (UTC).

ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Luxshare, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 ZF Automotive US, Inc , , Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against Luxshare, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-401

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al.

AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley

Respondents

Luxshare, Ltd.

The Fund for Protection of Investors' Rights in Foreign States

Others

Professors Tamar Meshel, Crina Baltag, Fabien G linas, and Janet Walker

Halliburton Company

Ashish Virmani

Institute of International Bankers

Dr. Xu Guojian, Li Hongji, Zhu Yongrui, Tang Qingyang, and Dr. Zhang Guanglei

The International Court of Arbitration of the International Chamber of Commerce and the United States Council for International Business

Professor Yanbai Andrea Wang

George A. Bermann, Robert H. Smit, D. Brian King, Ruth Teitelbaum, And Lucas Bento

International Arbitration Center in Tokyo

United States

Chamber of Commerce of the United States; Business Roundtable

Federal Arbitration, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Roman Martinez V

Attorney at Latham & Watkins, LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Joseph T. Baio

Attorney at Willkie, Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Mark Thomas Stancil

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

1875 K Street

Washington, DC 20006

Respondent Attorneys

Andrew Rhys Davies

Attorney at Allen and Overy LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Alexander Athan Yanos

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Other Attorneys

Lisa Wang Bohl

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

300 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 5350

Chicago, IL 60654

Jeffrey S. Bucholtz

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jason Moberly Caruso

Attorney at Newmeyer Dillion LLP

895 Dove Street, Fifth Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Derek T. Ho

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Katherine Burghardt Kramer

Attorney at DGW Kramer LLP

One Rockefeller Plaza, Suite 1060

New York, NY 10020

Linda Halliday Martin

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

601 Lexington Avenue, 31St Floor

New York, NY 10022

Michael Hugh McGinley

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jonathan B. New

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Robert Paul Parker

Attorney at Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C.

607 14Th Street, N.W, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

Elizabeth B. Prelogar

United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Peter Bowman Rutledge

215 Morton Avenue

Athens, GA 30605

Henry Sabath Weisburg

Attorney at Shearman and Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

03/11/2022: Reply of petitioners ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

03/11/2022: Reply of petitioners ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)

Main Document

03/11/2022: Reply of petitioners ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)

Proof of Service

03/11/2022: Reply of petitioners AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley filed (in 518). (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

03/11/2022: Reply of petitioners AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley filed (in 518). (Distributed)

Main Document

03/11/2022: Reply of petitioners AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley filed (in 518). (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

03/02/2022: Brief amicus curiae of Federal Arbitration, Inc. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)

Main Document

03/02/2022: Brief amicus curiae of Federal Arbitration, Inc. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)

Main Document

10/21/2021: Response to application from respondent Luxshare, Ltd. filed.

Proof of Service

10/15/2021: Application (21A80) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.

Main Document

10/15/2021: Application (21A80) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.

Certificate of Word Count

10/14/2021: Brief of respondent Luxshare, Ltd. in opposition filed.

Proof of Service

10/14/2021: Brief of respondent Luxshare, Ltd. in opposition filed.

Main Document

10/14/2021: Brief of respondent Luxshare, Ltd. in opposition filed.

opinion

06/13/2022: Judgment REVERSED. Barrett, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. VIDED.

Proof of Service

09/10/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due October 14, 2021)

Certificate of Word Count

09/10/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due October 14, 2021)

Petition

09/10/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due October 14, 2021)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment REVERSED. Barrett, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketArgued. For petitioners in 21-401: Roman Martinez, Washington, D. C. For petitioners in 21-518: Joseph T. Baio, New York, N. Y. For United States, as amicus curiae, supporting petitioners: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent in 21-401: Andrew R. Davies, New York, N. Y. For respondent in 21-518: Alexander A. Yanos, New York, N. Y. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioners ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioners AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley filed (in 518). (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Federal Arbitration, Inc. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of George A. Bermann, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed), Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Ashish Virmani filed (in 21-401). (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Professors Tamar Meshel, Crina Baltag, Fabien G linas, and Janet Walker filed (in 21-401). (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMotion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioners ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketApplication (21A80) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, entered August 17, 2021, is stayed pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketApplication (21A80) referred to the Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of applicants ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed., Reply, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to application from respondent Luxshare, Ltd. filed., Main Document, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketResponse to application (21A80) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due Thursday, October 21, by 4 p.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication (21A80) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh., Main Document, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of respondent Luxshare, Ltd. in opposition filed., Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due October 14, 2021), Petition, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less