This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 01/21/2023 at 06:25:11 (UTC).

West Virginia, et al., Petitioners v. Environmental Protection Agency, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 West Virginia, , Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against Environmental Protection Agency,. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1530

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Westmoreland Minings Holdings LLC in No. 20-1778

The North American Coal Corporation

Respondents

U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al.

Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District

Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents

America's Power in support

National Mining Association

State of New York, States and Municipalities

Others

91 Members of Congress

The Michigan House of Representatives, The Michigan Senate

The America First Policy Institute

The Buckeye Institute

Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence

Scholars of Congressional Accountability

Competitive Enterprise Institute

Southeastern Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Andrew Michael Grossman

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Jacob Moshe Roth

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Respondent Attorneys

Elizabeth B. Prelogar

United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Beth Susan Brinkmann

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Sean Hoe Donahue

Attorney at Donahue, Goldberg & Littleton

1008 Pennsylvania Avenue, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Elbert Lin

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

Riverfront Plaza, East Tower

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Misha Tseytlin

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

Suite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Barbara Dale Underwood

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005-1400

Other Attorneys

Jeffrey Steven Beelaert

Attorney at Stein Mitchell Beato & Missner LLP

Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

H. Christopher Bartolomucci

Attorney at Schaerr | Jaffe LLP

Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Jonathan Andrew Berry

Attorney at Boyden Gray & Associates

801 17Th St. Nw Suite 350

Washington, DC 20006

Jay Randall Carson

Attorney at The Buckeye Institute

88 East Broad St., Suite 1300

Columbus, OH 43215

Anthony Thomas Caso

174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620

Anaheim, CA 92805

Ruth Merewyn Greenwood

Attorney at Election Law Clinic, Harvard Law School

6 Everett St, Suite 5112

Cambridge, MA 02138

Sam Kazman

7Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Thomas Ryan McCarthy

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

29 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

opinion

06/30/2022: Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Alito, Gorsuch, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Alito, J., joined. Kagan, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. VIDED.

Proof of Service

02/17/2022: Reply of petitioners State of West Virginia, et al. filed (in 20-1530). (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

02/17/2022: Reply of petitioners State of West Virginia, et al. filed (in 20-1530). (Distributed)

Main Document

02/17/2022: Reply of petitioners State of West Virginia, et al. filed (in 20-1530). (Distributed)

Proof of Service

02/17/2022: Reply of petitioner The State North Dakota in No. 20-1780 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

02/17/2022: Reply of petitioner The State North Dakota in No. 20-1780 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

Main Document

02/17/2022: Reply of petitioner The State North Dakota in No. 20-1780 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

02/17/2022: Reply of petitioner Westmoreland Minings Holdings LLC in No. 20-1778 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

Main Document

02/17/2022: Reply of petitioner Westmoreland Minings Holdings LLC in No. 20-1778 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

Proof of Service

05/28/2021: Brief of respondent National Mining Association in support filed.

Certificate of Word Count

05/28/2021: Brief of respondent National Mining Association in support filed.

Main Document

05/28/2021: Brief of respondent National Mining Association in support filed.

Main Document

05/27/2021: Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2021 to July 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.

Blanket Consent

05/26/2021: Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, State of West Virginia, et al.

Proof of Service

04/29/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2021)

Certificate of Word Count

04/29/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2021)

Appendix

04/29/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2021)

Petition

04/29/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2021)

191 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Alito, Gorsuch, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Alito, J., joined. Kagan, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketArgued. For state petitioners: Lindsay S. See, Solicitor General, Charleston, W. Va. For private petitioners: Jacob M. Roth, Washington, D. C. For federal respondents: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For power company respondents: Beth S. Brinkmann, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioners State of West Virginia, et al. filed (in 20-1530). (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioner The State North Dakota in No. 20-1780 filed. VIDED. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioner Westmoreland Minings Holdings LLC in No. 20-1778 filed. VIDED. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioner The North American Coal Corporation filed. VIDED. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of respondent Basin Electric Power Cooperative filed. VIDED. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUpdate to Amended Corporate Disclosure Statements in the Power company respondents brief on the merits filed. VIDED. (Distributed), Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of National Parks Conservation Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 5, 2021, for all respondents.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2021 to August 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of respondent America's Power in support filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Kentucky filed., Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of respondent Basin Electric Power Cooperative in support filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of respondent National Mining Association in support filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2021, for all respondents.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2021 to July 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBlanket Consent filed by Petitioner, State of West Virginia, et al., Blanket Consent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2021), Petition, Appendix, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less