This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 01/14/2023 at 10:02:39 (UTC).

Warren Havens, Petitioner v. Arnold Leong, et al.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Warren Havens, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against Arnold Leong,. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-6529

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Warren Havens

Berkeley, CA 94704

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Warren Havens

2649 Benvenue Avenue

Berkeley, CA 94704

 

Court Documents

Main Document

04/15/2022: Application (21A627) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2022 to July 7, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.

Lower Court Orders/Opinions

04/15/2022: Application (21A627) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2022 to July 7, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 13, 2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketApplication (21A627) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 7, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication (21A627) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2022 to July 7, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito., Main Document, Lower Court Orders/Opinions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less