This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 01/14/2023 at 10:03:03 (UTC).

Terry Lynn King, Petitioner v. Tony Mays, Warden

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Terry Lynn King, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against Tony Mays, Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-6534

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Terry Lynn King

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Shawn Nolan

Independence Square West

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

Main Document

10/28/2022: Application (22A366) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.

Main Document

10/28/2022: Application (22A366) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.

Main Document

10/28/2022: Application (22A366) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.

Main Document

10/28/2022: Application (22A366) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.

Main Document

10/28/2022: Application (22A366) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.

Main Document

10/28/2022: Application (22A366) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.

Proof of Service

10/28/2022: Application (22A366) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.

Petition

01/11/2023: Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 13, 2023)

Appendix

01/11/2023: Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 13, 2023)

Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis

01/11/2023: Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 13, 2023)

Proof of Service

01/11/2023: Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 13, 2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 13, 2023), Petition, Appendix, Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketApplication (22A366) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 12, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication (22A366) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh., Main Document, Main Document, Main Document, Main Document, Main Document, Main Document, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less