This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 12:10:21 (UTC).

Sylvia Burwell, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Petitioners v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2013 Sylvia Burwell, Secretary of Health and Human Services, , Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    13-354

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sylvia Burwell, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.

Others

Church of the Lukumi Babalu Aye, Inc., et al. in support of non-Government parties

Association of American Physicians and Surgeons, Inc., et al. in support of non-Government parties

67 Catholic Theologians and Ethicists in support of non-Government parties

Religious Organizations in support of the Government

Historians and Legal Scholars in support of neither party

9 Academic Institutions, et al. in support of non-Government parties

Professor Emeritus of Law Charles E. Rice, et al. in support of non-Government parties

Liberty University and Liberty Counsel in support of non-Government parties

Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law in support of the Government

Westminster Theological Seminary in support of non-Government parties

California, et al. in support of the Government

Cato Institute in support of non-Government parties

Honorable Joseph B. Scarnati III, et al. in support of non-Government parties

Breast Cancer Prevention Institute, et al. in support of non-Government parties

91 Members of the United States House of Representatives in support of the Government

Foreign and Comparative Law Experts Lawrence O. Gostin, et al. in support of the Government

U.S. Women's Chamber of Commerce, et al. in support of the Government

Constitutional Accountability Center

National Women's Law Center, et al. in support of the Government

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Marci A. Hamilton

36 Timber Knoll Drive

Washington Crossing, PA 18977

Paul D. Clement

Attorney at Bancroft PLLC

1919 M Street, N.W., Suite 470

Washington, DC 20036

Thomas C. Berg

Attorney at University of St. Thomas School of Law

Msl 400, 1000 Lasalle Ave.

Minneapolis, MN 55403

Daniel H. Branch

3953 Maple Avenue, Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75219

Kelly J. Shackelford

Attorney at Liberty Institute

2001 Plano Parkway, Suite 1600

Plano, TX 75075

Dorothy Alicia Hickok

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David R. Langdon

Attorney at Langdon Law LLC

8913 Cincinnati-Dayton Rd.

West Chester, OH 45069

Scott W. Gaylord

Attorney at Elon University Law School

201 North Greene Street

Greensboro, NC 27401

Edward H. Trent

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900 P.O. Box 2231

Knoxville, TN 37901

Robert Joseph Muise

Attorney at American Freedom Law Center

P.O. Box 131098

Ann Arbor, MI 48113

Michael W. McConnell

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Timothy M. Sandefur

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

930 G Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Kevin Paul Martin

Attorney at Goodwin Proctor LLP

Exchange Place 53 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Erik S. Jaffe

Attorney at Erik S. Jaffe, P.C.

5101 34Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20008

Erin Morrow Hawley

University Of Missouri 212 Hulston Hall

Columbia, MO 62511

Noel J. Francisco

Jones Day 51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Ryan M. Malone

700 12Th Street, Nw Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Edward Tabash

Attorney at Law Office of Edward Tabash

433 North Camden Drive Suite 600

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

68 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Questions Presented

Questions Presented

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2014
  • DocketRecord returned for U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketAdjudged to be AFFIRMED. No. 13-356, REVERSED AND REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Kennedy, and Thomas, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed a concurring opinion. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Sotomayor, J., joined, and in which Breyer and Kagan, JJ., joined as to all but Part III-C-1. Breyer and Kagan, JJ., filed a dissenting opinion. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • DocketLetter from counsel for respondents filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • DocketArgued. For private parties: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For the federal government: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketA total of 90 minutes is allotted for oral argument and the time is to be divided equally. VIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketReply of petitioners Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • DocketBrief of respondents Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketCIRCULATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Honorable Joseph B. Scarnati III, et al. in support of non-Government parties filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2013
  • DocketReply of petitioners Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 26, 2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of American Jewish Committee (AJC) filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of California, et al. filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Physicians for Reproductive Health, et al. filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Ovarian Cancer National Alliance filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Association of Gospel Rescue Missions, et al filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketBrief of respondents Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., et al. filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2013)

    Read MoreRead Less