Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/08/2020 at 07:45:49 (UTC).

Saint Peter's Healthcare System, et al., Petitioners v. Laurence Kaplan

Case Summary

On 07/18/2016 Saint Peter's Healthcare System, , Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against Laurence Kaplan. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-86

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Supreme Court

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Saint Peter's Healthcare System, et al.

Others

Council for Christian Colleges & Universities, et al.

National Employment Lawyers Association

Christian Legal Society, et al.

the United States

The Catholic Health Association of the United States

Illinois Conference of the United Church of Christ, et al.

The General Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists

Pension Rights Center

Alliance Defending Freedom, and Thomas More Society

The Thomas More Society

United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.

Professor Daniel I. Halperin

Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc.

Church Defendant

The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty

Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al.

AARP, and AARP Foundation

The American Center for Law and Justice

United States

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lisa S. Blatt

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Other Attorneys

Laurence A. Hansen

Attorney at Locke Lord, LLP

111 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Karen L. Handorf

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 500 East

Washington, DC 20005

James A. Feldman

5335 Wisconsin Avenue, N.W. Suite 440

Washington, DC 20015

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Questions Presented

Questions Presented

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketJudgment REVERSED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which all other Members joined, except Gorsuch, J., who took no part in the consideration or decision of these cases. Sotomayor, J., filed a concurring opinion. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketArgued. For petitioners: Lisa S. Blatt, Washington, D. C.; and Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: James A. Feldman, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketReply of petitioners Advocate Health Care Network, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketMotion of the Deputy Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. VIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Professor Daniel I. Halperin filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of AARP, and AARP Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Pension Rights Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of National Employment Lawyers Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of The Catholic Health Association of the United States filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of The Thomas More Society filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Church Alliance filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketConsent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketConsent to the filing of amicus curaie briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for respondents.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketOrder extending time to file response to petition to and including September 16, 2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketApplication (15A1202) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 18, 2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketApplication (15A1202) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 16, 2016 to July 18, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito.

    Read MoreRead Less