This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 01/14/2023 at 18:00:50 (UTC).

Ronald Jeffrey Prible, Applicant v. Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Ronald Jeffrey Prible, Applicant filed an Other lawsuit against Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22A639

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ronald Jeffrey Prible

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jeffrey T. Green

1501 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

Main Document

01/06/2023: Application (22A639) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.

Lower Court Orders/Opinions

01/06/2023: Application (22A639) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.

Proof of Service

01/06/2023: Application (22A639) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketApplication (22A639) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 14, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication (22A639) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito., Main Document, Lower Court Orders/Opinions, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less