Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2020 at 11:35:46 (UTC).

Rimini Street, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Oracle USA, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 Rimini Street, Inc , , Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against Oracle USA, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-1625

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Supreme Court

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin

Respondent

Oracle USA Inc., et al.

Others

BSA | The Software Alliance

Professor Patrick T. Gillen

Scholars of Corpus Linguistics

Professor Steven Baicker-Mckee

Copyright Alliance

Ralph Oman

American Intellectual Property Law Association

Scholars of Linguistics

United States

National Music Publishers' Association, and Recording Industry Association of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mark Andrew Perry

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Respondent Attorney

Paul D. Clement

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

655 Fifteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Other Attorneys

Andrew John Pincus

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Joshua Craig McDaniel

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 W. Olive Avenue, 8Th Floor

Burbank, California, CA 91505

Gene Clayton Schaerr

Schaerr | Jaffe 1717 K Street Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Robert S. Friedman

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10112

Eleanor Martine Lackman

Attorney at Cowan Debaets Abrahams & Sheppard LLP

41 Madison Avenue, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10010

Melissa Arbus Sherry

555 Eleventh Street, Nw Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Stefan Michael Mentzer

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1095

Stephen Michael Nickelsburg

Attorney at Clifford Chance US LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Noel J. Francisco

Solicitor General United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Beth Susan Brinkmann

Attorney at Covington & Burling

850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

 

Court Documents

opinion

03/04/2019: Adjudged to be REVERSED IN PART and case REMANDED. Kavanaugh, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.

Proof of Service

01/04/2019: Reply of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

01/04/2019: Reply of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

01/04/2019: Reply of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

12/20/2018: Brief amicus curiae of Professor Steven Baicker-Mckee filed. (Distributed)

Proof of Service

12/20/2018: Brief amicus curiae of Professor Steven Baicker-Mckee filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

12/20/2018: Brief amicus curiae of Professor Steven Baicker-Mckee filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

12/20/2018: Brief amicus curiae of Copyright Alliance filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

12/20/2018: Brief amicus curiae of Copyright Alliance filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

08/14/2018: Reply of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed.

Proof of Service

08/01/2018: Brief of respondents Oracle USA Inc., et al. in opposition filed.

Certificate of Word Count

08/01/2018: Brief of respondents Oracle USA Inc., et al. in opposition filed.

Main Document

08/01/2018: Brief of respondents Oracle USA Inc., et al. in opposition filed.

Main Document

06/28/2018: Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 2, 2018 to August 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.

Certificate of Word Count

05/31/2018: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)

Proof of Service

05/31/2018: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)

Appendix

05/31/2018: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)

Petition

05/31/2018: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdjudged to be REVERSED IN PART and case REMANDED. Kavanaugh, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketArgued. For petitioners: Mark A. Perry, Washington, D. C.; and Allon Kedem, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketMotion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketJustice Alito is no longer recused in this case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Professor Steven Baicker-Mckee filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Copyright Alliance filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of BSA | The Software Alliance. filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of National Music Publishers' Association, and Recording Industry Association of America filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBlanket Consent filed by Respondents, Oracle USA Inc., et al., Blanket Consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBlanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin., Blanket Consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketPetition GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of respondents Oracle USA Inc., et al. in opposition filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 1, 2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response from July 2, 2018 to August 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk., Main Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018), Petition, Appendix, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    Read MoreRead Less