Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2021 at 19:37:38 (UTC).

Republic of Argentina, Petitioner v. NML Capital, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2013 Republic of Argentina, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against NML Capital, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    12-842

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Supreme Court

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Republic of Argentina

Respondent

NML Capital, Ltd.

Others

The Hispanic American Center for Economic Research

Montreux Partners, L.P., et al.

Professors Lester Brickman and The Center for the Rule of Law

South Carolina and 20 Other States

The Judicial Education Project and Professors of Law

Agudas Chasidei Chabad of United States

The Judicial Crisis Network

Competitive Enterprise Institute & Former State Department Officials

The Clearing House

Individual Bondholder Judgment Creditors

Aurelius Entities

National Association of Manufacturers

United States

Family Members and Estates of Victims of State-Sponsored Teerrorism

Additional Family Members of Victims of State-Sponsored Terrorism

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jonathan I. Blackman

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Respondent Attorney

Theodore B. Olson

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Other Attorneys

John S. Baker Jr.

Attorney at Louisiana State University Law Center

5209 Sea Chase Drive #5

Amelia Island, FL 32034

Jack L. Goldsmith

1563 Massachusetts Avenue

Cambridge, MA 02138

Richard M. Esenberg

139 E. Knapp Street

Milwaukee, WI 53202

James Emory Smith Jr.

Deputy Solicitor General P.O. Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29202-1549

Peter B. Rutledge

215 Morton Avenue

Athens, GA 30605

Nathan Lewin

Attorney at Lewin & Lewin, LLP

1775 Eye Street, N.W., Suite 850

Washington, DC 20036

Erin Morrow Hawley

University Of Missouri 212 Hulston Hall

Columbia, MO 62511

Sam Kazman

Attorney at Competitive Enterprise Institute

1899 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Jeffrey B. Wall

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1700 New York Ave., N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

William C. Heuer

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

Roy T. Englert Jr.

Attorney at Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP

1801 K Street, N.W., Suite 411

Washington, DC 20006

Catherine E. Stetson

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Donald B. Verrilli Jr.

Solicitor General United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Edwin S. Kneedler

Deputy Solicitor General United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Mark W. Mosier

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1201 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

William M. Jay

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

901 New York Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

Questions Presented

Questions Presented

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • DocketAdjudged to be AFFIRMED. Scalia, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, Breyer, Alito, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Sotomayor, J., took no part in the decision of the case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • DocketArgued. For petitioner: Jonathan I. Blackman, New York, N. Y.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Theodore B. Olson, Washington, D. C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketMotion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketReply of petitioner Republic of Argentina filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of The Judicial Crisis Network filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Professors Lester Brickman and The Center for the Rule of Law filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Individual Bondholder Judgment Creditors filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of The Judicial Education Project and Professors of Law filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Agudas Chasidei Chabad of United States filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketSupplemental brief of respondent NML Capital, Ltd. filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 10, 2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of United States filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketSupplemental brief of petitioner Republic of Argentina filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • DocketThe Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 12, 2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DocketReply of petitioner Republic of Argentina filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketBrief of respondent NML Capital, Ltd. in opposition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • DocketOrder extending time to file response to petition to and including March 11, 2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2013)

    Read MoreRead Less