This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 01/14/2023 at 13:00:27 (UTC).

Pavel Ivanovich Lazarenko, Petitioner v. United States

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Pavel Ivanovich Lazarenko, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-652

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pavel Ivanovich Lazarenko

Respondent

United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Matthew Nis Leerberg

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

Suite 2800

Raleigh, NC 27601

Respondent Attorney

Elizabeth B. Prelogar

United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

 

Court Documents

Main Document

12/02/2022: Application (22A498) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 11, 2022 to February 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. (Justice Kagan is recused.)

Petition

01/10/2023: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 13, 2023)

Certificate of Word Count

01/10/2023: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 13, 2023)

Proof of Service

01/10/2023: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 13, 2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 13, 2023), Petition, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketApplication (22A498) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 10, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication (22A498) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 11, 2022 to February 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. (Justice Kagan is recused.), Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less