This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 09:33:27 (UTC).

National Federation of Independent Business, et al., Petitioners v. Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2011 National Federation of Independent Business, , Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    11-393

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

National Federation of Independent Business, et al.

Respondent

Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.

Others

Family Research Council, et al.

American Center for Law and Justice, et al. (Severability)

David R. Riemer and Community Advocates

United States Senate

Court-appointed amicus curiae

David Boyle

Long Beach, CA 90815

American Hospital Association, et al. (Severability)

Association of American Physicians and Surgeons, et al. (Severability)

American Public Health Association, et al. (Severability)

American Medical Student Association, et al. (Severability)

California, et al. (Severability)

Texas Public Policy Foundation and Cato Institute (Severability)

American Civil Rights Union (Severability)

Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

Michigan Legal Services, Inc., et al. (Severability)

AARP, et al. (Severability)

American Academy of Actuaries (Severability)

Joella Swan, et al.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mark A. Packman

Attorney at Gilbert Randolph LLP

1100 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

Paul D. Clement

Attorney at Bancroft PLLC

1919 M Street, N.W. Suite 470

Washington, DC 20036

Gary G. Kreep

United States Justice Foundation 932 D Street, Suite 3

Ramona, CA 92065

Thomas M. Christina

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

Suite 500 300 North Main Street

Greenville, SC 29601

Christopher A. Koster

Attorney at Attorney General of Missouri

Office Of The Attorney General P.O. Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102

James R. Napoli

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw Suite 400,Ssouth

Washignton, DC 20004

Mario Loyola

Texas Public Policy Foundation 900 Congress Ave. Suite 400

Austin, TX 78704

Richard P. Hutchison

Attorney at Landmark Legal Foundation

3100 Broadway Suite 1210

Kansas City, MO 64111

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Questions Presented

Questions Presented

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketAdjudged to be AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART. Roberts, C. J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered the opinion of the Court with respect to Parts I, II, and III-C., in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined; an opinion with respect to Part IV, in which Breyer and Kagan, JJ., joined; and an opinion with respect to Parts III-A, III-B, and III-D. Ginsburg, J., filed an opinion concurring in part, concurring in the judgment in part, and dissenting in part, in which Sotomayor, J., joined, and in which Breyer and Kagan, JJ., joined as to Parts I, II, III, and IV. Scalia, Kennedy, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., filed a dissenting opinion. Thomas, J, filed a dissenting opinion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketMotion of David Boyle for reconsideration of motion for leave to intervene DENIED. VIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketMotion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 7, 2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • DocketMotion for reconsideraton of motion for leave to intervene, in support of Court-appointed amicus on the issue of severability filed by David Boyle. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • DocketLetter received from National Federation of Independent Business (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DocketMotion for leave to intervene filed by David Boyle DENIED. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketArgued. For petitioners: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For Court-appointed amicus curiae: H. Bartow Farr, III, Washington, D. C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketMotion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2012
  • DocketMotion for leave to intervene, in support of Court-appointed amicus on the issue of severability, filed by David Boyle. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2011
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketBrief of respondents Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. filed. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondents Florida, et al. to respond filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • DocketConsent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for State Respondents, Florida, et al. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • DocketConsent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents, the Solicitor General. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketConsent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs , in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners. VIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • DocketAppendix of National Federation of Independent Business, et al. filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2011)

    Read MoreRead Less