This case was last updated from PACER on 06/18/2020 at 15:52:30 (UTC).

Joseph David Robertson, Petitioner v. United States

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Joseph David Robertson, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    18-609

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joseph David Robertson

Respondent

United States

Others

National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center

Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence

Duarte Nursery, Inc., et al.

National Association of Home Builders

Cato Institute

Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anthony Lee Francois

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

930 G Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Respondent Attorney

Noel J. Francisco

Solicitor General United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Other Attorneys

Paul J. Beard II

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1121 L Street, Suite 700

Sacramento, CA 95834

John C. Eastman

Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence C/O Fowler School Of Law Chapman University One University Drive

Orange, CA 92866

Anthony Thomas Caso

Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence One University Drive

Orange, CA 92866

Peter Stanley Prows

Attorney at Briscoe Ivester & Bazel LLP

155 Sansome Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94104

Thomas Jon Ward

National Association Of Home Builders 1201 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Ilya Shapiro

Attorney at Cato Institute

1000 Massachusetts Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Chris Fedeli

Attorney at Judicial Watch, Inc.

Judicial Watch, Inc., 425 Third Street, Sw Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

04/07/2019: Letter of April 7, 2019 from counsel for petitioner filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

04/07/2019: Letter of April 7, 2019 from counsel for petitioner filed. (Distributed)

Proof of Service

03/27/2019: Motion to substitute Carri Robertson, as authorized representative, as petitioner in place of Joseph David Robertson, Deceased under Rule 35.1 filed.

Main Document

03/27/2019: Motion to substitute Carri Robertson, as authorized representative, as petitioner in place of Joseph David Robertson, Deceased under Rule 35.1 filed.

Proof of Service

03/22/2019: Reply of petitioner Joseph David Robertson filed.

Certificate of Word Count

03/22/2019: Reply of petitioner Joseph David Robertson filed.

Main Document

03/22/2019: Reply of petitioner Joseph David Robertson filed.

Proof of Service

03/11/2019: Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.

Main Document

03/11/2019: Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.

Main Document

12/06/2018: Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2018 to January 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.

Blanket Consent

11/29/2018: Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joseph David Robertson.

Proof of Service

11/07/2018: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2018)

Certificate of Word Count

11/07/2018: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2018)

Petition

11/07/2018: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2018)

Other

07/26/2018: Application (18A108) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.

Other

07/26/2018: Application (18A108) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.

Main Document

07/26/2018: Application (18A108) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.

Other

07/26/2018: Application (18A108) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketPetition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for consideration of the question whether the case is moot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketThe motion to substitute Carri Robertson, authorized representative, as petitioner in place of Joseph D. Robertson, Deceased is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of April 7, 2019 from counsel for petitioner filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to substitute Carri Robertson, as authorized representative, as petitioner in place of Joseph David Robertson, Deceased under Rule 35.1 filed., Main Document, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioner Joseph David Robertson filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of respondent United States in opposition filed., Main Document, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 11, 2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2019 to March 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk., Main Document

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 9, 2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2018 to January 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk., Main Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBlanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joseph David Robertson., Blanket Consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2018), Petition, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketApplication (18A108) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 7, 2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication (18A108) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy., Other, Main Document, Other, Other

    Read MoreRead Less