This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2020 at 19:17:05 (UTC).

Georgia, et al., Petitioners v. Public.Resource.Org, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 Georgia, , Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against Public Resource Org, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    18-1150

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Supreme Court

 

Party Details

Petitioner

State of Georgia, et al.

Respondent

Public.Resource.Org, Inc.

Others

116 Law Librarians and 5 Law Library Organizations

Next-Generation Legal Research Platforms and Databases

Next-Generation Legal Research Platforms and Databases and Digital Accessibility Advocate

Internet Association

36 Computational Law Scholars

The Software & Information Industry Association

Caselaw Access Project

Arkansas, et al.

The R Street Institute, the Wikimedia Foundation, and Public Knowledge

American Library Association, et al.

39 Law Students, 24 Solo and Small-Firm Practitioners of Law, and 38 Legal Educators

American Society For Testing And Materials, et al.

Brendan Keefe, in His Official Capacity as Chief Investigative Reporter for 11Alive Atlanta, and WXIA-TV

Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press & 25 Media Organizations

Professor Shyamkrishna Balganesh and Professor Peter S. Menell

University Of California Univ. Of California, Berkeley School Of Law 225 Bancroft Way

Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

Matthew Bender & Co., Inc.

Current and Former Government Officials

Law Professors Nina Mendelson, et al.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Joshua Stephen Johnson

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20037

Respondent Attorney

Eric F. Citron

Attorney at Goldstein & Russell, P.C.

7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850

Bethesda, MD 20814

Other Attorneys

Marc Rotenberg

Electronic Privacy Information Center (Epic) 1718 Connecticut Ave., Nw Suite 200

Washington, DC 20009

Jessica Paulie Weber

Attorney at Brown, Goldstein & Levy, LLP

120 E. Baltimore Street, Suite 1700

Baltimore, MD 21202

James Hamilton

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

David D. Cole

American Civil Liberties Union Foundation 915 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Noel J. Francisco

Solicitor General United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Nancy E. Wolff

Attorney at Cowan DeBaets Abrahams & Sheppard LLP

41 Madison Avenue, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10010

Brian D. Wassom

Warner Norcross + Judd 45000 River Ridge Drive Suite 300

Clinton Twp., MI 48038

Amy Christine Chai

National Association Of Home Builders 1201 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

opinion

04/27/2020: Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Sotomayor, Kagan, Gorsuch, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Alito, J., joined, and in which Breyer, J., joined as to all but Part IIA and footnote 6. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer, J., joined.

Proof of Service

11/08/2019: Reply of petitioners State of Georgia, et al. filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

11/08/2019: Reply of petitioners State of Georgia, et al. filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

11/08/2019: Reply of petitioners State of Georgia, et al. filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

10/16/2019: Brief amicus curiae of Caselaw Access Project filed.

Proof of Service

10/16/2019: Brief amicus curiae of Caselaw Access Project filed.

Main Document

10/16/2019: Brief amicus curiae of Caselaw Access Project filed.

Certificate of Word Count

10/16/2019: Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Nina Mendelson, et al. filed.

Main Document

10/16/2019: Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Nina Mendelson, et al. filed.

Main Document

03/22/2019: Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2019 to May 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.

Proof of Service

03/01/2019: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2019)

Certificate of Word Count

03/01/2019: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2019)

Appendix

03/01/2019: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2019)

Petition

03/01/2019: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2019)

Proof of Service

12/07/2018: Application (18A598) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.

Lower Court Orders/Opinions

12/07/2018: Application (18A598) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.

Lower Court Orders/Opinions

12/07/2018: Application (18A598) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.

Main Document

12/07/2018: Application (18A598) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.

123 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdjudged to be AFFIRMED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Sotomayor, Kagan, Gorsuch, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Alito, J., joined, and in which Breyer, J., joined as to all but Part IIA and footnote 6. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer, J., joined.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketArgued. For petitioners: Joshua S. Johnson, Washington, D. C.; and Anthony A. Yang, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Eric F. Citron, Bethesda, Md.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioners State of Georgia, et al. filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMotion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCIRCULATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRecord requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Caselaw Access Project filed., Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Law Professors Nina Mendelson, et al. filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Print Disability Advocates filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 10, 2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk., Main Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Matthew Bender & Co., Inc. filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of The Software & Information Industry Association filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2019 to May 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk., Main Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2019), Petition, Appendix, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketApplication (18A598) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 4, 2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication (18A598) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas., Main Document, Lower Court Orders/Opinions, Lower Court Orders/Opinions, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less