Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2020 at 07:19:27 (UTC).

Fane Lozman, Petitioner v. City of Riviera Beach, Florida

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 Fane Lozman, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against City of Riviera Beach, Florida. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-21

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Supreme Court

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fane Lozman

Respondent

Riviera Beach, FL

Others

National Press Photographers Association and 25 Media and Free Speech Organizations

Institute for Justice, et al.

Roderick and Solange Macarthur Justice Center

Institute for Free Speech

United States

District of Columbia, et al.

Marion B. Brechner First Amendment Project, et al.

State of Alaska

First Amendment Foundation, et al.

National Association of Counties, et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pamela Susan Karlan

Attorney at Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic

559 Nathan Abbott Way

Stanford, CA 94305-8610

Respondent Attorney

Shay Dvoretzky

Jones Day 51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Other Attorneys

Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1919 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006

Michael B. Kimberly

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

David Michael Shapiro

375 East Chicago Avenue

Chicago, IL 60611

Floyd Abrams

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Jeffrey Bryan Wall

Acting Solicitor General United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Loren L. AliKhan

Attorney at D.C. Office of the Attorney General

Deputy Solicitor General 441 4Th St., Nw, Suite 600 South

Washington, DC 20001

Clay Calvert

University Of Florida 2060 Weimer Hall Po Box 118400

Gainesville, FL 32611

Dario Borghesan

Attorney at State of Alaska Department of Law

1031 W. Fourth Ave. Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

Ginger D. Anders

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson

1155 F St. Nw 7Th Floor

Washington, DC 20004

Bennett L. Cohen

Attorney at Polsinelli, PC

1401 Lawrence St. Suite 2300

303-572-9300, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

02/16/2018: Reply of petitioner Fane Lozman filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

01/26/2018: Brief of respondent Riviera Beach, FL filed. (Distributed)

Other

12/29/2017: Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.

Certificate of Word Count

12/29/2017: Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.

Main Document

12/29/2017: Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Foundation, et al. filed.

Proof of Service

12/29/2017: Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice, et al. filed.

Main Document

12/29/2017: Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice, et al. filed.

Main Document

12/27/2017: Brief amici curiae of Marion B. Brechner First Amendment Project, et al. filed.

Blanket Consent

12/19/2017: Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Fane Lozman

opinion

06/18/2018: Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Breyer, Alito, Sotomayor, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion.

Certificate of Word Count

02/16/2018: Reply of petitioner Fane Lozman filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

01/29/2018: Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al. filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

01/29/2018: Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

01/29/2018: Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

01/26/2018: Brief of respondent Riviera Beach, FL filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

12/29/2017: Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.

Main Document

12/22/2017: Joint appendix filed.

Certificate of Word Count

12/22/2017: Brief of petitioner Fane Lozman filed.

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketThe record from the U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of Florida has been returned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketStatement of Printing Cost of Fane Lozman not accepted for filing. (August 03, 2018 - Document not meant for electronic filing.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Breyer, Alito, Sotomayor, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketArgued. For petitioner: Pamela S. Karlan, Stanford, Cal. For respondent: Shay Dvoretzky, Washington, D. C.; and Jeffrey B. Wall, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioner Fane Lozman filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketMotion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed., Proof of Service, Main Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al. filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketBrief of respondent Riviera Beach, FL in opposition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketOrder extending time to file response to petition to and including October 11, 2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketResponse Requested. (Due September 11, 2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of First Amendment Foundation filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondent Riviera Beach, FL to respond filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketApplication (16A1100) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 28, 2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketApplication (16A1100) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 29, 2017 to June 28, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.

    Read MoreRead Less