This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 02/03/2023 at 21:41:21 (UTC).

Elk Grove Unified School District and David W. Gordon, Superintendent, Petitioners v. Michael A. Newdow, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2003 Elk Grove Unified School District and David W Gordon, Superintendent, Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against Michael A Newdow,. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    02-1624

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Respondent

United States

Others

United States Senate

American Civil Rights Union

American Humanist Association, et al.

Joseph R. Grodin

Christian Legal Society, et al.

Religious Scholars and Theologians

Common Good Foundation, et al.

Rutherford Institute

National Lawyers Association Foundation

Grassfire.Net and Hundreds of Thousands of Americans

Sandra Banning

Americans United for Separation of Church and State

Rev. Dr. Betty Jane Bailey, et al.

Secular Humanism

Center for Individual Freedom

John Cornyn, Jon Kyl, Lindsey Graham, Larry Craig, Saxby Chambliss, et al.

Washington, DC 20510

Buddhist Temples, et al.

Catholic League for Religious and Civil Rights and Thomas More Law Center

United Fathers of America, et al. and Atheists for Human Rights

38 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Pamela L. Sumners

528 N. Humphrey Ave.

Oak Park, IL 60302

Sharon L. Browne

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

930 G Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Paul Sanford

6113 Jason Court

Aptos, CA 95003

Ronald K. Losch

Attorney at Losch & Erlich

1 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael C. Worsham

1916 Cosner Road

Forest Hill, MD 21050

Phyllis Schafly

Attorney at Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund

7800 Bonhomme Avenue

St. Louis, MO 63105

Kevin J. Hasson

1875 I Street, Nw Suite 500

Washington, DC 20006

Geraldine R. Gennet

General Counsel Us House Of Representatives 219 Cannon House Office Bldg.

Washington, DC 20515

Lawrence G. Wasden

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 83720

Boise, ID 83720-0010

Martin E. Karlinsky

Katten Muchin Zavis Rosenbaum 575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Eric L. Hirschhorn

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

1400 L Street. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Thurston Greene

37 Crescent Road

Millbrook, NY 12545

Theodore Garelis

Office Of The Ag, 1300 I Street, P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Bernard P. Reese Jr.

Reese And Reese 979 North Main Street

Rockford, IL 61103

39 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Questions Presented

Questions Presented

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2004
  • DocketRecord returned to U.S.D.C. - Eastern District of California.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2004
  • DocketRecord returned to U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • DocketAcknowledgement of receipt (08/27/04) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2004
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2004
  • DocketRehearing DENIED. Justice Scalia took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2004
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2004
  • DocketPetition for Rehearing filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2004
  • DocketJudgment REVERSED. Stevens, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Kennedy, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Rehnquist, C. J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment, in which O'Connor, J., joined, and in which Thomas, J., joined as to Part I. O'Connor, J., and Thomas, J., filed opinions concurring in the judgment. Scalia, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2004
  • DocketArgued. For petitioners: Terence J. Cassidy, Sacramento, Cal. For respondent United States, in support of petitioners: Theodore B. Olson, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For respondent: Michael A. Newdow, Sacramento, Cal. (Arguing pro-se.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2004
  • DocketMotion for reconsideration of the order denying their motion for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument. DENIED. Justice Scalia took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2003
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Americans United for Separation of Church and State filed. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2003
  • DocketMotion for leave to file amici brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2003
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Gray Davis, Governor of CA filed. VIDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2003
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Texas Assn. of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund, et al. filed. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Idaho, et al. filed. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2003
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of American Legion filed. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2003
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of US House of Representatives filed. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of United States Senate filed. VIDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2003
  • DocketAppendix of Elk Grove Unified School District and David W. Gordon filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2003
  • DocketPetition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 9, 2003)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less