This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 06/01/2022 at 11:16:15 (UTC).

Donald J. Trump, Petitioner v. Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Donald J Trump, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against Wisconsin Elections Commission,. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-883

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Donald J. Trump

Respondents and Others

Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al.

Democratic National Commitee

Dane County Clerk and Dane County Board of Canvassers

Wisconsin State Conference NAACP; Dorothy Harrell; Wendell J. Harris, Sr.; Earnestine Moss

George L. Christenson, Julietta Henry

Governor Tony Evers

Satya Rhodes-Conway, Maribeth Witzel-Behl, and Scott McDonell

Cory Mason, Mayor of the City of Racine, et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

William Bock III

Attorney at Kroger, Gardis & Regas, LLP

Suite 900

Indianapolis, IN 46204-5125

Respondent and Other Attorneys

Thomas Charles Bellavia

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

Po Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

John M. Devaney

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 Thirteenth Street Nw Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

David Ray Gault

210 Martin Luther Luther King, Jr. Blvd., Room 419

Madison, WI 53703

Joseph Salter Goode

Attorney at Laffey, Leitner & Goode LLC

325 E. Chicago St., Suite 200

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Andrew Alston Jones

Attorney at Hansen Reynolds LLC

Suite 400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Jeffrey A. Mandell

Attorney at Stafford Rosenbaum, LLP

Suite 900

Madison, WI 53703

Michael P. May

Attorney at Boardman & Clark LLP

One S. Pinckney Street, Suite 400

Madison, WI 53701

Daniel S. Lenz

Attorney at Lawton & Cates, S.C.

345 W. Washington Ave., Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

12/30/2020: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)

Main Document

01/15/2021: Waiver of Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. of right to respond submitted.

Proof of Service

12/30/2020: Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner.

Certificate of Word Count

12/30/2020: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)

Main Document

12/30/2020: Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner.

Petition

12/30/2020: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)

Certificate of Word Count

02/09/2021: Supplemental brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.

Proof of Service

02/09/2021: Supplemental brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.

Main Document

02/09/2021: Supplemental brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.

Main Document

01/27/2021: Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. to respond filed.

Main Document

01/27/2021: Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. to respond filed.

Main Document

01/25/2021: Waiver of right of respondent George L. Christenson, Julietta Henry to respond filed.

Main Document

01/22/2021: Waiver of right of respondents Cory Mason, Mayor of the City of Racine, et al. to respond filed.

Main Document

01/22/2021: Waiver of right of respondents Cory Mason, Mayor of the City of Racine, et al. to respond filed.

Main Document

01/21/2021: Waiver of right of respondent Democratic National Commitee to respond filed.

Main Document

01/21/2021: Waiver of right of respondents Wisconsin State Conference NAACP; Dorothy Harrell; Wendell J. Harris, Sr.; Earnestine Moss to respond filed.

Main Document

01/20/2021: Waiver of right of respondent Governor Tony Evers to respond filed.

Main Document

01/19/2021: Waiver of right of respondent Satya Rhodes-Conway, Maribeth Witzel-Behl, and Scott McDonell to respond filed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPetition DENIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed., Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondent Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondent Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondent George L. Christenson, Julietta Henry to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondents Cory Mason, Mayor of the City of Racine, et al. to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondents Cory Mason, Mayor of the City of Racine, et al. to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondent Democratic National Commitee to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondents Wisconsin State Conference NAACP; Dorothy Harrell; Wendell J. Harris, Sr.; Earnestine Moss to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondent Governor Tony Evers to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondent Satya Rhodes-Conway, Maribeth Witzel-Behl, and Scott McDonell to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of right of respondents Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. to respond filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMotion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner., Main Document, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021), Petition, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less