This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 03/25/2022 at 22:48:33 (UTC).

Donald J. Trump, former President of the United States, Petitioner v. Bennie G. Thompson, in His Official Capacity as Chairman of the United States House Select Committee to Investigate the January 6th Attack on the United States Capitol, et al.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 Donald J Trump, former President of the United States, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against Bennie G Thompson, in His Official Capacity as Chairman of the United States House Select Committee to Investigate the January 6th Attack on the United States Capitol,. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-932

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Donald J. Trump

Respondents

Bennie G. Thompson and the House of Representatives Select Committee to Investigate the January 6th Attack on the United States Capitol

Executive Branch Respondents

Others

States United Democracy Center and Former Federal, State, and Local Officials

Jack Jordan

North Kansas City, MO 64116

Government Accountability Project, Government Information Watch, National Security Counselors, Louis Fisher, Heidi Kitrosser, Mark J. Rozell, Jonathan Shaub, and Mitchel A. Sollenberger

America First Legal Foundation

Former White House Chief of Staff Mark R. Meadows

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jesse Ryan Binnall

Attorney at Binnall Law Group, PLLC

717 King Street, Suite 200

Alexandria, VA 22314

Respondent Attorneys

Douglas Neal Letter

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

5140 O'Neill House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Elizabeth B. Prelogar

United States Department Of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Other Attorneys

Norman L. Eisen

1420 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jack Revels Tucker Jordan

3102 Howell Street

North Kansas City, MO 64116

Kelly Brian McClanahan

4702 Levada Terrace

Rockville, MD 20853

Reed Darrow Rubinstein

Attorney at America First Legal Foundation

Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20005

George J. Terwilliger III

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

888 16Th Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

01/19/2022: Reply of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.

Certificate of Word Count

01/19/2022: Reply of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.

Main Document

01/19/2022: Reply of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.

opinion

01/19/2022: The application for stay of mandate and injunction pending review presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is denied. The questions whether and in what circumstances a former President may obtain a court order preventing disclosure of privileged records from his tenure in office, in the face of a determination by the incumbent President to waive the privilege, are unprecedented and raise serious and substantial concerns. The Court of Appeals, however, had no occasion to decide these questions because it analyzed and rejected President Trumps privilege claims under any of the tests [he] advocated, Trump v. Thompson, 20 F. 4th 10, 33 (CADC 2021), without regard to his status as a former President, id., at 4046. Because the Court of Appeals concluded that President Trumps claims would have failed even if he were the incumbent, his status as a former President necessarily made no difference to the courts decision. Id., at 33 (noting no need [to] conclusively resolve whether and to what extent a court, at a former Presidents behest, may second guess the sitting Presidents decision to release privileged documents); see also id., at 17 n. 2. Any discussion of the Court of Appeals concerning President Trumps status as a former President must therefore be regarded as nonbinding dicta. Justice Thomas would grant the application. Statement of Justice Kavanaugh respecting denial of application. (Detached opinion)

Proof of Service

01/18/2022: Brief amici curiae of Government Accountability Project, et al. filed.

Certificate of Word Count

01/18/2022: Brief amici curiae of Government Accountability Project, et al. filed.

Main Document

01/18/2022: Brief amici curiae of Government Accountability Project, et al. filed.

Proof of Service

01/13/2022: Reply of applicant Donald J. Trump filed.

Reply

01/13/2022: Reply of applicant Donald J. Trump filed.

Proof of Service

12/29/2021: Supplemental brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.

Main Document

12/29/2021: Supplemental brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.

Proof of Service

12/23/2021: Application (21A272) for a stay of mandate and injunction pending review, submitted to The Chief Justice.

Main Document

12/23/2021: Application (21A272) for a stay of mandate and injunction pending review, submitted to The Chief Justice.

Proof of Service

12/23/2021: Motion for expedited consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by respondents.

Main Document

12/23/2021: Motion for expedited consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by respondents.

Proof of Service

12/23/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 24, 2022)

Certificate of Word Count

12/23/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 24, 2022)

Petition

12/23/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 24, 2022)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPetition DENIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketMotion for leave to file amici brief filed by States United Democracy Center, et al. GRANTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe application for stay of mandate and injunction pending review presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is denied. The questions whether and in what circumstances a former President may obtain a court order preventing disclosure of privileged records from his tenure in office, in the face of a determination by the incumbent President to waive the privilege, are unprecedented and raise serious and substantial concerns. The Court of Appeals, however, had no occasion to decide these questions because it analyzed and rejected President Trumps privilege claims under any of the tests [he] advocated, Trump v. Thompson, 20 F. 4th 10, 33 (CADC 2021), without regard to his status as a former President, id., at 4046. Because the Court of Appeals concluded that President Trumps claims would have failed even if he were the incumbent, his status as a former President necessarily made no difference to the courts decision. Id., at 33 (noting no need [to] conclusively resolve whether and to what extent a court, at a former Presidents behest, may second guess the sitting Presidents decision to release privileged documents); see also id., at 17 n. 2. Any discussion of the Court of Appeals concerning President Trumps status as a former President must therefore be regarded as nonbinding dicta. Justice Thomas would grant the application. Statement of Justice Kavanaugh respecting denial of application. (Detached opinion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketApplication (21A272) referred to the Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Government Accountability Project, et al. filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply of applicant Donald J. Trump filed., Reply, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Jack Jordan filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for leave to file amici brief filed by States United Democracy Center, et al., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to application from respondents Bennie G. Thompson and the House of Representatives Select Committee to Investigate the January 6th Attack on the United States Capitol filed., Main Document, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of respondents Bennie G. Thompson and the House of Representatives Select Committee to Investigate the January 6th Attack on the United States Capitol in opposition filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to application from Executive Branch Respondents filed., Proof of Service, Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of Executive Branch Respondents in opposition filed., Main Document, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Former Executive Branch Lawyers., Main Document, Proof of Service, Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed., Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for expedited consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by respondents., Main Document, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication (21A272) for a stay of mandate and injunction pending review, submitted to The Chief Justice., Main Document, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 24, 2022), Petition, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less