This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 01/14/2023 at 18:00:35 (UTC).

David Freeman, Applicant v. John Q. Hamm, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 David Freeman, Applicant filed an Other lawsuit against John Q Hamm, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22A637

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

David Freeman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John Anthony Palombi

Attorney at Federal Defenders

817 South Court Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

Main Document

01/10/2023: Application (22A637) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2023 to March 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas.

Lower Court Orders/Opinions

01/10/2023: Application (22A637) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2023 to March 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas.

Proof of Service

01/10/2023: Application (22A637) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2023 to March 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketApplication (22A637) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 21, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication (22A637) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2023 to March 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas., Main Document, Lower Court Orders/Opinions, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less