This case was last updated from U.S. Supreme Court on 01/30/2023 at 06:58:39 (UTC).

CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. John Doe, One, et al.

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 CVS Pharmacy, Inc , , Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against John Doe, One,. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1374

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al.

Respondent

John Doe One, et al.

Others

United States

The District of Columbia and 17 states

Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates

Center for Health Law & Policy Innovation, et al.

AIDS Healthcare Foundation

The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

Constitutional Accountability Center

Pharmaceutical Care Management Association

Emory Environmental Law Society

Washington Legal Foundation and Cato Institute

Washington Legal Foundation and Independent Women's Law Center

Paralyzed Veterans of America et al.

National Conference of State Legislatures, et al.

NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Independent Women's Law Center

States of Louisiana, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Mississippi, Nebraska, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, and Utah

The Arc of the United States and the American Associatio of People with Disabilities, et al.

America's Health Insurance Plans

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lisa Schiavo Blatt

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Respondent Attorney

Gerald Sinclair Flanagan

6330 San Vicente Blvd., Suite 250

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Other Attorneys

Wayne Turner

Attorney at National Health Law Program

1444 L Street Nw, Suite 1105

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

Main Document

11/11/2021: Joint stipulation to dismiss the writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed.

Proof of Service

10/29/2021: Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

10/29/2021: Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

10/29/2021: Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)

Proof of Service

10/29/2021: Brief amici curiae of National Health Law Program and Disability Rights California filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

10/29/2021: Brief amici curiae of National Health Law Program and Disability Rights California filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

10/29/2021: Brief amici curiae of National Health Law Program and Disability Rights California filed. (Distributed)

Certificate of Word Count

10/29/2021: Brief amicus curiae of Emory Environmental Law Society filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

10/29/2021: Brief amicus curiae of Emory Environmental Law Society filed. (Distributed)

Main Document

04/30/2021: Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Independent Women's Law Center filed.

Proof of Service

04/30/2021: Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed.

Certificate of Word Count

04/30/2021: Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed.

Main Document

04/30/2021: Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed.

Main Document

04/05/2021: Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2021 to June 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.

Proof of Service

03/26/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)

Certificate of Word Count

03/26/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)

Appendix

03/26/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)

Petition

03/26/2021: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketWrit of Certiorari Dismissed - Rule 46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint stipulation to dismiss the writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMotion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of National Health Law Program and Disability Rights California filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Emory Environmental Law Society filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Center for Health Law & Policy Innovation, et al. filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of The Arc of the United States and the American Association of People with Disabilities, et al. filed. (Distributed), Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAmici brief of The Arc of the United States and the American Association of People with Disabilities, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted--November 05, 2021).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief of respondents John Doe One, et al. in opposition filed., Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed., Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Care Management Association filed., Main Document, Proof of Service, Certificate of Word Count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Independent Women's Law Center filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed., Main Document, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2021 to June 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk., Main Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2021), Petition, Appendix, Certificate of Word Count, Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less