Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 09:13:40 (UTC).

Arizona, et al., Petitioners v. United States

Case Summary

On 08/12/2011 Arizona, , Petitioners filed an Other lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Supreme Court, U.S. Supreme Court. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    11-182

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Supreme Court

 

Party Details

Respondent

United States

Others

Former Commissioners of the United States Immigration and Naturalization Service

American Unity Legal Defense Fund

Thomas More Law Center, et al.

U.S. Reps Lamar Smith, et al.

Arizona Employers for Immigration Reform, et al.

Secure States Initiative

Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice, et al.

Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al.

National Immigrant Justice Center, et al.

Service Employees International Union, et al.

Justice and Freedom Fund

American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations

Constitutional Accountability Center

United Mexican StatesRepublic of HaitiArgentina, et al.

Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund

Members of Congress and the Committee to Protect America's Border

U.S. Border Control, et al.

EarthRights International in support of neither party

Greater Houston Partnership

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Michael B. de Leeuw

Attorney at Fried Frank Harris Shriver & Jacobson LLP

One New York Plaza

New York, NY 10004

James F. Peterson

Judicial Watch, Inc 425 Third Street, Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Paul D. Clement

Attorney at Bancroft PLLC

1919 M Street, N.W., Suite 470

Washington, DC 20036

Lawrence J. Joyce

Attorney at Lawrence J. Joyce, LLC

1517 N. Wilmot Rd., #215

Tucson, AZ 85712

Nancy Morawetz

Attorney at Washington Square Legal Services Inc.

245 Sullivan Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10012

Clifford M. Sloan

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

1440 New York Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Jennifer C. Newell

American Civil Liberties 39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark R. von Sternberg

1011 First Ave.

New York, NY 10022

John W. Whitehead

Attorney at The Rutherford Institute

1440 Sachem Place

Charlottesville, VA 22901

Brian J. Murray

Jones Day 77 West Wacker Dr., Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Questions Presented

Questions Presented

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketAdjudged to be AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Breyer, and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. Scalia, J., Thomas, J., and Alito, J., filed opinions concurring in part and dissenting in part. Kagan, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • DocketArgued. For petitioners: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr. Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketReply of petitioners Arizona, et al. filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Argentina, et al. filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Republic of Haiti filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Service Employees International Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Anti-Defamation League filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of United Mexican States filed. (Distributed)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2011
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al. filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • DocketBrief amici curiae of Members of Congress and the Committee to Protect America's Border filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketOrder extending time to file response to petition to and including October 12, 2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketBrief amicus curiae of American Unity Legal Defense Fund filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • DocketConsent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • DocketPetition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 12, 2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • DocketApplication (10A1277) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 10, 2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketApplication (10A1277) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2011 to August 10, 2011, submitted to Justice Kennedy.

    Read MoreRead Less