This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/17/2020 at 21:42:40 (UTC).

Zim Industries Inc vs. Saeid Shadanloo

Case Summary

On 05/04/2017 Zim Industries Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Saeid Shadanloo. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zim Industries Inc

Defendants

Shadanloo, Saeid

Signature Farms Ltd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCourt's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 03/06/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Signature Farms Ltd and Does 1-10) filed by Zim Industries Inc on 02/27/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCourt's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 03/06/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketAbstract issued on 12/19/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketAbstract issued on 12/19/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketJudgment for Zim Industries Inc against Shadanloo, Saeid in the amount of: 60000.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 10/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketJudgment - Stipulated filed by Zim Industries Inc on 10/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Colin R Higgins in Support of Entry of Judgment against Defenant Saeid Shadanloo Pursuant to the Stipulation for Entry of Judgment) filed by Zim Industries Inc on 10/04/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/04/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement (completion date: 12/31/2018) filed by Zim Industries Inc on 07/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/04/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zim Industries Inc on 05/04/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed by Zim Industries Inc on 05/04/2017. Filed By: Zim Industries Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Signature Farms Ltd(Defendant) | Shadanloo, Saeid(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zim Industries, Inc. is a litigant