Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 01:15:37 (UTC).

Zechariah Donald James Wolf vs. USA Swimming

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 Zechariah Donald James Wolf filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USA Swimming. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wolf, Zechariah Donald James

Defendants

Buenaventura Swim Club

Paseo Aquatics Swim Team

Paseo Aquatics Sports LLC

USA Swimming

City of San Buenaventura

Ventura Aquatic Center

City of San Buenaventura owner of Ventura Aquatic Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE, VICTOR L

Defendant Attorneys

Schlagel, Cameron J

Bergsten, Robert T

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Buenaventura Swim Club; USA Swimming on 01/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (on Defendants Buenaventura Swim Club and USA Swimming Demurrers to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) filed by Buenaventura Swim Club; USA Swimming on 12/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Description: to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Negligence; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Description: to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Negligence; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 12/14/2020 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketReply (Brief of Def Buenaventura Swim Club to Plaintiffs Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) filed by Buenaventura Swim Club on 12/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketReply (Brief of Def USA Swimming to Plaintiffs Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) filed by USA Swimming on 12/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Additional 30 Days to File Responsive Pleading CCP 430.41 (of Cameron J Schlagel) filed by City of San Buenaventura; USA Swimming; Buenaventura Swim Club on 01/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMotion for Change of Venue (Motion by Deft City of San Buenaventura (esa Ventura Aquatic Center) for Order Transferring Action to Ventura County Superior Court Pursuant to CCP 394; Declaration of Cameron J Schlagel; [Proposed] Order) filed by City of San Buenaventura; USA Swimming on 01/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Isreal Calderon, Registered Agent) filed by Wolf, Zechariah Donald James on 01/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Kelsey, Manager) filed by Wolf, Zechariah Donald James on 01/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Brandon Pearlman, Front Desk) filed by Wolf, Zechariah Donald James on 01/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Standing Order; Second Amended Standing Order) filed by Wolf, Zechariah Donald James on 01/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Other (Standing Order re Personal Injury Procedures, Central District) filed by Wolf, Zechariah Donald James on 01/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wolf, Zechariah Donald James on 01/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint (19STCV32661) filed by Wolf, Zechariah Donald James on 01/30/2020. Filed By: Wolf, Zechariah Donald James(Plaintiff) Refers To: Paseo Aquatics Swim Team(Defendant) | Ventura Aquatic Center(Defendant) | Buenaventura Swim Club(Defendant) | USA Swimming(Defendant) | City of San Buenaventura(Defendant) | Paseo Aquatics Sports LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA SWIMMING INC is a litigant