This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 00:20:55 (UTC).

Yoalli Correa vs. Jessica Hasson

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Yoalli Correa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jessica Hasson. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Correa, Yoalli

Defendant

Hasson, Jessica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINGSTON, PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Hasson, Jessica on 01/26/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Hasson, Jessica on 09/21/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Hasson, Jessica on 09/21/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Hasson, Jessica on 09/21/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/10/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Correa, Yoalli on 06/10/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Correa, Yoalli on 06/10/2020. Filed By: Correa, Yoalli(Plaintiff) Refers To: Hasson, Jessica(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less