This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 21:12:57 (UTC).

Yasmin Amilee vs. Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. a corporation

Case Summary

On 10/28/2016 Yasmin Amilee filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc a corporation. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amilee, Yasmin

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DCH Simi Valley INC

Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. a corporation

A. Fanticola Companies Inc. a corporation

A Fanticola Companies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARR, ROBERT L

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Smith, Kevin

MURPHY, THOMAS M.

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Cohen, Kyle

Gilman, Emmett

Smith, Kevin

MURPHY, THOMAS M.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 09/27/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (cross complt filed by DCH Simi Valley Inc) filed by DCH Simi Valley INC on 08/18/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal (and proof of service) filed by A. Fanticola Companies Inc. a corporation on 08/15/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (cross complaint of A Fanticola Only) filed by A. Fanticola Companies Inc. a corporation on 08/15/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2016
  • Cross-Complaint filed by DCH Simi Valley INC on 12/01/2016. Filed By: DCH Simi Valley INC(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: A Fanticola Companies(Cross - Defendant) | A. Fanticola Companies Inc. a corporation(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • A Fanticola Companies added as a Cross - Defendant effective 12/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Answer filed by DCH Simi Valley INC on 12/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served on Vivian Imperial Agent for CT Corp) filed by Amilee, Yasmin on 11/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Vivian Imperial CT corp. Agent) filed by Amilee, Yasmin on 11/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served on Vivian Imperial Agent at CT Corp) filed by Amilee, Yasmin on 11/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/24/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Amilee, Yasmin on 10/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Complaint filed by Amilee, Yasmin on 10/28/2016. Filed By: Amilee, Yasmin(Plaintiff) Refers To: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. a corporation(Defendant) | DCH Simi Valley INC(Defendant) | A. Fanticola Companies Inc. a corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less