This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 00:04:43 (UTC).

Wolcott vs Starbucks

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Wolcott filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Starbucks. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wolcott, Rita Renee

Wolcott, Thomas

Defendant

Starbucks Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Agu, Kenechi R

Defendant Attorneys

Pelletier, Stephen T

Baxter, Samuel S.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Protective Order) filed by Starbucks Corporation on 03/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Starbucks Corporation on 10/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Starbucks Corporation on 10/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Description: the Request for Attorneys fees from Plaintiffs' Complaint; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/28/2020 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 09/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 09/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike - the Request for Attorneys fees from Plaintiffs' Complaint scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike (the Request for Attorneys' Fees from Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages) filed by Starbucks Corporation on 09/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDemurrer filed by Starbucks Corporation on 09/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wolcott, Thomas; Wolcott, Rita Renee on 07/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wolcott, Thomas; Wolcott, Rita Renee on 07/29/2020. Filed By: Wolcott, Thomas(Plaintiff) | Wolcott, Rita Renee(Plaintiff) Refers To: Starbucks Corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baxter, Samuel S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pelletier, Stephen Thomas