This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 02:44:52 (UTC).

William Wallace vs. Dial Security

Case Summary

On 05/20/2015 William Wallace filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Dial Security. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wallace, William

Defendant

Dial Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Burt, Joshua A.

Defendant Attorney

LIGHT, JONATHAN FRASER

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2015
  • Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 10/19/2015 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/30/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Stipulation - Other (for binding arbitration) filed by Dial Security on 10/19/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Case Management Statement filed by Dial Security on 10/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Answer filed by Dial Security on 07/20/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (sub served Meagan Cooper authorized to accept) filed by Wallace, William on 06/11/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/19/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wallace, William on 05/20/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • Complaint filed by Wallace, William on 05/20/2015. Filed By: Wallace, William(Plaintiff) Refers To: Dial Security(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less