This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/05/2018 at 16:26:11 (UTC).

WILLIAM SHIRK VS CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA

Case Summary

On 02/24/2006 WILLIAM SHIRK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9332

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

WILLIAMSON, DAVID

SHIRK, JULIE

WILLIAMSON, MARY

SHIRK, WILLIAM

LEIS, SUE

BULMER, MARGE

BULMER DEVELOPMENTCORPORATION

SENECA GARDENS LIMITED

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF SAN BUENAV

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF SAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

DOBBERTEEN, ERIC L

GONZALEZ, RAFAEL

SORENSEN, LAWRENCE T.

NETTESHEIM, CHRISTOPH T

KELLEY, PAUL M.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

HURTADO, CAROLINE R

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Consolidate (CLM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:41 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:33 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:20 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 11:58 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:52 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Application (EXP); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Continuance of Trial (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
340 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2006
  • 06/06/2006: Proof of Service (PERSONAL) of Summons and COMPLAINT of SHIRK served on CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA with service date of 06/01/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2006
  • 06/06/2006: Substitution of Attorney filed. Former attorney PRO/PER removed as to JULIE SHIRK and replaced with attorney CHRISTOPH T NETTESHEIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2006
  • 06/06/2006: Substitution of Attorney filed. Former attorney PRO/PER removed as to WILLIAM SHIRK and replaced with attorney CHRISTOPH T NETTESHEIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • 04/19/2006: Order Extending Time for Filing of PROOF OF SERVICE filed by WILLIAM SHIRK, JULIE SHIRK, time extended to 06/02/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • 02/24/2006: Vertical Case Assignment 41 - Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • 02/24/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by WILLIAM SHIRK, JULIE SHIRK (Complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case (amount over $25,000) Receipt Number: 602240306 for $320.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • 02/24/2006: Track Assignment: Standard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • 02/24/2006: Case Information Sheet filed: Type of trial requested: JURY. Estimated time of trial: 4-5 DAYS. Mediation eligible: NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • 02/24/2006: Track Assignment: Standard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • 02/24/2006: Complaint (Unlimited) filed Filed By: SHIRK, JULIE(Plaintiff) | SHIRK, WILLIAM(Plaintiff) Refers To: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF SAN BUENAV(Defendant) | CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BULMER DEVELOPMENTCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURTADO, CAROLINE R