This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/22/2021 at 11:41:35 (UTC).

William Hall vs. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 William Hall filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hall, William

Defendants

Silver Star Motor Car Company

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDZANT, BARRY L

Defendant Attorney

Shugart, Johnathan M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint for Damages (Violation of Consumer Warranty Acts)) filed by General Motors LLC on 01/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Agent for service: CSC Lawyers Incorporating Services; Lai Saevang, Agent of Service. Date of service: 12/16/2020. Cost 67.99) filed by Hall, William on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hall, William on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hall, William on 11/19/2020. Filed By: Hall, William(Plaintiff) Refers To: Silver Star Motor Car Company(Defendant) | General Motors LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUGART JONATHAN M