This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 20:52:26 (UTC).

Westport Properties vs. Wyndell John Wright

Case Summary

On 11/25/2014 Westport Properties filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Wyndell John Wright. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westport Properties

Defendant

Wright, Wyndell John

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion - Other (SC); Description: Request for Court Order and Answer- Grant Judgment; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2017
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Motion - Other (SC) heard 05/18/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Motion - Other (SC) - Request for Court Order and Answer- Grant Judgment scheduled for 05/18/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2014
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Granted filed by Wright, Wyndell John on 12/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 02/09/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) filed by Wright, Wyndell John on 12/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted) filed by Wright, Wyndell John on 12/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Wright, Wyndell John Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Wright, Wyndell John on 12/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal (served on 12-2-2014, cost $35.00) filed by Westport Properties on 12/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Westport Properties on 11/25/2014. Filed By: Westport Properties(Plaintiff) Refers To: Wright, Wyndell(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESPORT PROPERTIES INC is a litigant