This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 15:40:05 (UTC).

Westlake Village Marketplace vs Enright

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Westlake Village Marketplace filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Enright. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC

Defendants

Stephanie Lynn Lopez Trustee of the Victor Enright Qualified Personal Residence Trust ua

Victor Frank Enright aka Victor F Enright individually and as Trustee of the Vic Enright Living Trust ua

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eramo, Martin P

Defendant Attorney

LOEB, STEVEN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Compel; Description: Supplemental Response to Request for Production of Documents and Actual Production; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 01/29/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 01/29/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Supplemental Response to Request for Production of Documents and Actual Production scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement (in Compliance with California Rules of Court Section 3.1020 Setting Forth the Specific Discovery Requests for Which this Court's Order to Compel is Sought) filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 01/29/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Supplemental Response to Request for Production of Documents and Actual Production; Declaration of Martin P. Eramo; Concurrently Filed Separate Statement) filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 01/29/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Victor Frank Enright aka Victor F Enright individually and as Trustee of the Vic Enright Living Trust ua November 28 2016; Stephanie Lynn Lopez Trustee of the Victor Enright Qualified Personal Residence Trust ua dated March 6 2019 on 01/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 12/15/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 12/03/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 12/03/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketLOEB, STEVEN S added as a effective 07/22/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Victor Frank Enright aka Victor F Enright individually and as Trustee of the Vic Enright Living Trust ua November 28 2016; Stephanie Lynn Lopez Trustee of the Victor Enright Qualified Personal Residence Trust ua dated March 6 2019 on 07/21/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Martin P Eramo Re Notice of Pendency of Action) filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 07/06/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 07/06/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 06/10/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC on 06/10/2020. Filed By: WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Victor Frank Enright aka Victor F Enright individually and as Trustee of the Vic Enright Living Trust ua November 28 2016(Defendant) | Stephanie Lynn Lopez Trustee of the Victor Enright Qualified Personal Residence Trust ua dated March 6 2019(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Westlake Village Marketplace, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERAMO, MARTIN PETER