This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/11/2022 at 00:16:01 (UTC).

Western States vs. County of Ventura

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Western States filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against County of Ventura. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Western States Petroleum Association

Respondents

Ventura County Board of Supervisors

County of Ventura

Interested Parties

Ventura County Agricultural Association

Ventura County Coalition of Labor Agriculture and Business

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DINTZER, JEFFREY D.

Angiolillo, Gina M

Berlin, Gregory S

Wickersham, Matthew C

Respondent Attorney

Zischke, Michael H

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 10:11 AM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 10:03 AM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Writ of Mandate; Description: [CEQA]; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Orders) filed by County of Ventura; Ventura County Board of Supervisors on 04/27/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Further Status (CEQA); Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Update to Joint Case Management Conference Statement) filed by County of Ventura; Ventura County Board of Supervisors on 04/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketReiser, Glen M. added as a Discovery Referee effective 04/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Further Status (CEQA); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference heard 04/11/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Further Status (CEQA) scheduled for 04/25/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 at Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Report and Recommendation of Discovery Referee re Privilege And Work Product Claims on the Administrative Record) filed by Reiser, Glen M. on 04/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Ana Hall Clerk of the Board) filed by Western States Petroleum Association on 11/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Ana Hall Clerk of the Board) filed by Western States Petroleum Association on 11/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 10:11 AM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Order of Reassignment heard 10/29/2020 10:11:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 41 effective 10/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued on 10/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketRequest - Other (for Hearing Pursuant to Public Resources Code Section 21167.4) filed by Western States Petroleum Association on 10/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western States Petroleum Association on 10/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate (and Complaint for Declaratory Relief [Pub Res Code 21000 et seq. (CEQA); CCP 1085 (alternatively 1094.5)]) filed by Western States Petroleum Association on 10/15/2020. Filed By: Western States Petroleum Association(Petitioner) Refers To: Ventura County Board of Supervisors(Respondent) | County of Ventura(Respondent) | Ventura County Agricultural Association(Interested Party) | Ventura County Coalition of Labor Agriculture and Business(Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ventura County Coalition of Labor Agriculture and Business is a litigant

Latest cases where Ventura County Board of Supervisors is a litigant