Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 00:33:30 (UTC).

West American Roofing Inc vs. DEX Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 03/17/2015 West American Roofing Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEX Systems Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West American Roofing Inc

Defendant

DEX Systems Inc

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 23; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 23; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 23; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 23; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2017
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 05/01/2015 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 05/01/2015 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for dismissal after mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for dismissal after mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (served Mary Fitzsimmons, receptionist on 3/18/15; costs 40.00) filed by West American Roofing Inc on 03/24/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 05/01/2015 at 01:30:00 PM in 23 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by West American Roofing Inc on 03/17/2015. Filed By: West American Roofing Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: DEX Systems Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where West American Roofing Inc is a litigant